No. 16-1215
Title:Lamar, Archer & Cofrin, LLP, Petitioner
v.
R. Scott Appling
Docketed:April 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11911)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2017)
May 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 25, 2017.
May 25 2017Brief of respondent R. Scott Appling in opposition filed.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
May 31 2017Reply of petitioner Lamar, Archer & Cofrin, LLP filed. (Distributed)
Jun 19 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 01 2017Supplemental brief of respondent R. Scott Appling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Second supplemental brief of respondent R. Scott Appling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 17, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Brief of petitioner Lamar, Archer & Cofrin, LLP filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2018Brief of respondent R. Scott Appling filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Richard Aaron, Laura Bartell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Record requested from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Honorable Eugene Wedoff (Ret.), et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Apr 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 04 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioner Lamar, Archer & Cofrin, LLP filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 17 2018Argued. For petitioner: Gregory G. Garre, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Paul Hughes, Washington, D. C.; and Jeffrey E. Sandberg, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jun 04 2018Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Breyer, and Kagan, JJ., joined, and in which Thomas, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined, as to all but Part III-B.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Lamar, Archer & Cofrin, LLP
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

phughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: R. Scott Appling
Other
John Collen
    Counsel of Record
SmithAmundsenLLP
150 N. Michigan Ave
33d Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jcollen@salawus.com
3123164345
Party name: LAW PROFESSORS RICHARD AARON, LAURA BARTELL, ET AL.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston
1800 M. St. N.W.
Suite 450 North
Washington, DC 20036

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: Honorable Eugene Wedoff
Brian David Schmalzbach
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

bschmalzbach@mcguirewoods.com
8047754746
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center