No. 16-1206
Title:Finn Batato, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:April 7, 2017
Linked with 16A747
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1360)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2017Application (16A747) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2017 to April 7, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jan 26 2017Application (16A747) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 7, 2017.
Apr 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2017)
Apr 14 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
May 03 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 7, 2017.
May 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.
Jun 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jun 21 2017Reply of petitioners Finn Batato, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Finn Batato, et al. filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
777 6th Street, NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20004

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202)-538-8000
Party name: Finn Batato, et al.
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
777 6th Street NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20001

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202)-538-8000
Party name: Finn Batato, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Darpana M. ShethInstitute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dsheth@ij.org
(703)-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice, et al.