No. 16-1190
Title:Michael Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3671)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2017)
Apr 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 2, 2017.
May 25 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 3, 2017.
Jul 03 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jul 13 2017Reply of petitioner Michael Davis filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John D. Cline
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of John D. Cline
235 Montgomery Street
Suite 1070
San Francisco, CA 94104

cline@johndclinelaw.com
(415) 662-2260
Party name: Michael Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States