No. 16-1189
Title:E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bobbi-Jo Smiley, et al.
Docketed:April 3, 2017
Linked with 16A755
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4583)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2017Application (16A755) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 28, 2017 to March 30, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor (Justice Alito is recused).
Feb 07 2017Application (16A755) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 30, 2017.
Mar 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2017)
Apr 28 2017Brief of respondents Bobbi-Jo Smiley, et al. in opposition filed.
May 01 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Cato Institute.
May 03 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation, et al .
May 12 2017Reply of petitioners E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, et al. filed.
May 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
May 24 2017Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Burt M. Rublin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard, Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street
51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

rublin@ballardspahr.com
(215) 864-8116
Party name: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas More Marrone
    Counsel of Record
MOREMARRONE LLC
1601 Market Street #2500
Philadelphia, PA 19103

tom@moremarrone.com
(215) 966-4142
Party name: Bobbi-Jo Smiley, et al.
Patricia V. PierceGreenblatt, Pierce, Funt & Flores, LLC
125 South 9th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107-0000

(215) 735-1600
Party name: Bobbi-Jo Smiley, et al.
Other
Anthony L. FrancoisPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

alf@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al
Ilya ShapiroCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202) 842-2000
Party name: The Cato Institute