No. 16-1180
Title:Janice K. Brewer, former Governor of Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al.
Docketed:March 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15307)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2017)
Apr 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017.
May 01 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
May 01 2017Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
May 01 2017Brief amicus curiae of Governor Jeb Bush filed.
May 01 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
May 22 2017Brief of respondents Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 01 2017Reply of petitioners Janice K. Brewer, former Governor of Arizona, et al. filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Dominic E. Draye
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of Arizona Attorney General
1275 W. Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
(602) 542-3333
Party name: Janice K. Brewer, former Governor of Arizona, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer C. Newell
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jnewell@aclu.org
(415)-343-0774
Party name: Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al.
Michael King Thomas TanACLU
125 Broad St., 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

mtan@aclu.org
347.714.0740
Party name: Arizona Dream Act Coalition, et al.
Other
Michael M. HethmonImmigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue, N. W.
Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

mhethmon@irli.org
(202) 232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Scott A. KellerSolicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
William J. OlsonWilliam J.Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
(703) 356-5070
Party name: United States Justice Foundation, et al.
Stephen S. SchwartzSchaerr I Duncan, LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

sschwartz@schaerr-duncan.com
(202) 787-1060
Party name: Governor Jeb Bush