No. 16-1177
Title:Virginia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Dennis LeBlanc
Docketed:March 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-7151)
   Decision Date:November 10, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2017)
May 01 2017Brief of respondent Dennis LeBlanc in opposition filed.
May 01 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Dennis LeBlanc.
May 05 2017Reply of petitioners Virginia, et al. filed.
May 08 2017Letter of May 4, 2017, from counsel for petitioners waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 12 2017Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion). Justice Ginsburg, concurring in the judgment. (Detached Opinion).
Jul 05 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Jul 13 2017DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 07 2017Rehearing DENIED.
Aug 07 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stuart A. Raphael
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

sraphael@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bryan A. Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
Equal Justice Initiative
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

bstevenson@eji.org
(334) 269-1803
Party name: Dennis LeBlanc