No. 16-1171 | |
Title: | GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Petitioner v. M. M., a Minor, By and Through Her Mother and Next Friend, Audrey Meyers, et al. |
Docketed: | March 28, 2017 |
Linked with 16A806 | |
Lower Ct: | Appellate Court of Illinois, First District |
Case Numbers: | (1-15-1909) |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2016 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | November 23, 2016 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 09 2017 | Application (16A806) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 21, 2017 to March 23, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Feb 10 2017 | Application (16A806) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 23, 2017. |
Mar 23 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 27, 2017) |
Apr 19 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 30, 2017. |
Apr 27 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. |
Apr 27 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America filed. |
May 30 2017 | Brief of respondents M. M. ex rel, Meyers, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. |
Jun 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner GlaxoSmithKline LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 06 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Glaxo Smith Kline LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 11 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondents M. M., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz Counsel of Record | King & Spalding LLP 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20006 | (202) 737-0500 |
Party name: Glaxo Smith Kline LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Robert S. Peck Counsel of Record | One Riverside Park, Suite 12A New York, NY 10069 robert.peck@cclfirm.com | (202) 944-2874 |
Party name: M. M., et al. | ||
Other | ||
Mark Haddad | Sidley Austin LLP 555 West Fifth Street Los Angeles, CA 90013 mhaddad@sidley.com | (213) 896-6604 |
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America | ||
Andrew J. Pincus | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 apincus@mayerbrown.com | (202) 263-3000 |
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America |