No. 16-1167
Title:Ohio, Petitioner
v.
Brandon Moore
Docketed:March 27, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2014-0120)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2017)
Mar 31 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2017.
May 26 2017Brief of respondent Brandon Moore in opposition filed.
May 26 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Brandon Moore.
Jun 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ralph Michael Rivera
    Counsel of Record
Mahoning County Prosecutor's Office
21 W. Boardman Street, 6th Floor
Youngstown, OH 44503

rrivera@mahoningcountyoh.gov
(330)-740-2330
Party name: Ohio
Attorneys for Respondent
Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1148 Neil Avenue

Columbus, OH 43201

Rachel@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Brandon Moore