No. 16-1161
Title:Beverly R. Gill, et al., Appellants
v.
William Whitford, et al.
Docketed:March 24, 2017
Linked with 16A1149
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(15-cv-421-bbc)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 24 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 24, 2017)
Mar 24 2017Appendix of Beverly R. Gill, et al. filed.
Apr 05 2017Order extending time to file response to statement as to jurisdiction to and including May 15, 2017.
Apr 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for the appellants filed.
Apr 24 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Wisconsin Institute for Law and Liberty filed.
Apr 24 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Apr 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin State Senate, et al. filed.
Apr 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Apr 24 2017Brief amici curiae of The Republican National Committee, et al. filed.
May 08 2017Motion to affirm filed by appellees William Whitford, et al.
May 18 2017Opposition to motion to affirm of appellants Beverly R. Gill, et al. filed.
May 22 2017Application (16A1149) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
May 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
May 24 2017Response to application (16A1149) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, June 7, 2017, by 11 a.m. ET.
May 25 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief in support of stay filed by Wisconsin State Senate, et al.
Jun 07 2017Response to application from respondent William Whitford, et al. filed.
Jun 08 2017Reply of applicant Beverly R. Gill, et al. filed.
Jun 09 2017Application (16A1149) referred to the Court.
Jun 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the judgment of the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin, case No. 3:15-cv-00421, entered January 27, 2017, amended February 22, 2017, and corrected March 15, 2017, is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in this Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application for stay.
Jun 19 2017Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits.
Jul 13 2017Consent to the filing of timely amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or neither party from counsel for the appellants received.
Jul 17 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party, or neither party from counsel for the appellees received.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 3, 2017.
Jul 28 2017Brief of appellant Beverly R.Gill, et al. filed.
Jul 28 2017Joint appendix filed. (2 Volumes) (Statement of costs filed)
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Western Dist. of Wisconsin.
Aug 03 2017Brief amicus curiae of Republican National Committee filed.
Aug 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Aug 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Tennessee State Senators filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Majority Leader and Temporary President of the New York State Senate and members of the Majority Coalition filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of the Legacy Foundation filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Republican State Leadership Committee filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Congressional Committee filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in the Maryland Redistricting Litigation, Benisek v. Lamone (formerly Shapiro v. McManus), supporting neither party filed.
Aug 04 2017Brief amici curiae of American Civil Rights Union, et al. filed.
Aug 09 2017Record received from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Wisconsin. ( 1 Envelope )
Aug 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eric McGhee in support of neither party filed.
Aug 10 2017Brief amici curiae of Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Aug 14 2017CIRCULATED.
Aug 28 2017Brief of appellees William Whitford, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Heather K. Gerken, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 30 2017Motion of Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eric S. Lander filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of American Jewish Committee, et al. filed.(Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of 44 Election Law, Scientific Evidence, and Empirical Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of Colleagues of Professor Norman Dorsen filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Political Science Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor D. Theodore Rave filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Political Geography Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Senators John McCain and Sheldon Whitehouse filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Historians filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Republican Statewide Officials Senators Bill Brock, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of League of Conservation Voters, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Media and Democracy filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of California Citizens Redistricting Commission, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Represent.Us, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Current Members of Congress, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of 65 Current and Former State Legislators filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of League of Women Voters filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Fairvote and One Nation One Vote filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Election Law and Constitutional Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle filed. (Distributed)
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Robin Best, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Reply of appellants Beverly R. Gill, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 25 2017Motion of Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 03 2017Argued. For appellants: Misha Tseytlin, Solicitor General, Madison, Wis.; and Erin E. Murphy, Washington, D. C. (for Wisconsin State Senate, et al., as amici curiae.) For appellees: Paul M. Smith, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Beverly R. Gill, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: William Whitford, et al.
Other
J. Christian Adams
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington Street, Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204

adams@publicinterestlegal.org
317-203-5599
Party name: American Civil Rights Union, et al.
Robert A. Atkins
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

ratkins@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Political Science Professors
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Efrem M. Braden
    Counsel of Record
Baker &Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202 861-1504
Party name: Republican State Leadership Committee
Douglas Andrew Chin
    Counsel of Record
University of North Carolina School of Law
160 Ridge Road, CB #3380
Chapel Hill, NC 27599-3380

chin@unc.edu
919-962-4116
Party name: 44 Election Law, Scientific Evidence, and Empirical Legal Scholars
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly
Douglas R. Cox
    Counsel of Record
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dcox@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
Paul A. Diller
    Counsel of Record
Willamette University College of Law
245 Winter Street, SE
Salem, OR 97301

pdiller@willamette.edu
(503)-370-6595
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Gregory L. Diskant
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
212-336-2000
Party name: Common Cause
Ira M. Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

ira.feinberg@hoganlovells.com
(212)-918-3000
Party name: League of Conservation Voters, et al.
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1 S. Dearborn St.
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
312-853-7875
Party name: Political Geography Scholars
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Republican Statewide Officials Senators Bill Brock, et al.
Heather Gerken
    Counsel of Record
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

heather.k.gerken@yale.edu
203-432-1650
Party name: Heather K. Gerken, et al.
Jacqueline C. Gerrald
    Counsel of Record
McLaughlin & Stern, LLP
260 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10016

jgerrald@mclaughlinstern.com
212-448-1100
Party name: Robin Best, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Current Members of Congress, et al.
Perry Maxwell Grossman
    Counsel of Record
New York Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

pgrossman@nyclu.org
212-607-3300
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Benjamin Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street
Salem, OR 97301-4096

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: States of Oregon, et al.
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP
435 Tasso Street
Suite 205
Palo Alto, CA 94301

khartnett@bsfllp.com
(650) 798-3508
Party name: League of Women Voters
Thomas Josefiak
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Drive
Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

tomj@hvjt.law
540-8808
Party name: The Legacy Foundation
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
(650) 725-4851
Party name: Law Professors
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-1101

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202)-263-3000
Party name: Plaintiffs in the Maryland Redistricting Litigation, Benisek v. Lamone (formerly Shapiro v. McManus), supporting neither party
David Edward Leit
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler, LLP
One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068

dleit@lowenstein.com
973-597-2500
Party name: American Jewish Committee, et al.
Justin Michael Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Loyola Law School
919 Albany Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015

justin.levitt@lls.edu
213-736-7417
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al.
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Bipartisan Group of 65 Current and Former State Legislators
David L. Lewis
    Counsel of Record
225 BroadwaySuite 3300
New York, NY 10007

dlewis@lewisandfiore.com
(212) 285-2290
Party name: Majority Leader and Temporary President of the New York State Senate and members of the Majority Coalition
Eric M McLeod
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell
33 East Main Street, Suite 300
P.O. Box 1379
Madison, WI 53701

Eric.McLeod@huschblackwell.com
608-234-6056
Party name: Wisconsin Manufacturers & Commerce
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
Atara Miller
    Counsel of Record
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy, LLP
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

amiller@milbank.com
212-530-5000
Party name: Represent.US, et al.
Michael T. Morley
    Counsel of Record
223 Pawnee Road
Cranford, NJ 07016

michaelmorleyesq@hotmail.com
(860)-778-3883
Party name: Republican National Committee
Mark W. Mosier Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
(202)-662-6000
Party name: Senators John McCain and Sheldon Whitehouse
Justin Adatto Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.
1000 Louisana,
Suite 5100
Seattle, WA 77002

jnelson@susmangodfrey.com
(713-651-9366
Party name: Fairvote and One Nation One Vote
Burt Neuborne
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

burt.neuborne@nyu.edu
212-998-6172
Party name: Colleagues of Professor Norman Dorsen
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Bradley S. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

brad.phillips@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: Election Law and Constitutional Law Scholars
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Donald Theodore Rave
    Counsel of Record
University of Houston Law Center
2402 Calhoun Rd.
Room 142 BLB
Houston, TX 77204

teddy.rave@gmail.com
713-743-2499
Party name: Professor D. Theodore Rave
Ezra David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Lawyer's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1401 New York Ave., N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org
(202) 662-8600
Party name: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie in support of neither party
John L. Ryder
    Counsel of Record
40 South Main St., Suite 2700
Memphis, TN 38103

jryder@harrisshelton.com
901-545-1455
Party name: Tennessee State Senators
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Historians
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Constitutional Law Professors
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
415-543-8700
Party name: California Citizens Redistricting Commission, et al.
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
(540) 341-8808
Party name: National Republican Congressional Committee
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of Congress
H. Reed Witherby
    Counsel of Record
Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo, LLP
99 Summer Street, Suite 1530
Boston, MA 02110

rwitherby@smithduggan.com
617-228-4407
Party name: Eric S. Lander
Joseph H. Yeager
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels, LLP
300 North Meridian Street
Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN 46204

jay.yeager@faegrebd.com
317 237 0300
Party name: Center for Media and Democracy
Daniel F KolbDavis Polk & Wardwell LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

Daniel.Kolb@DavisPolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Eric McGhee in support of neither party
Erin E. MurphyKirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

emurphy@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly