No. 16-1153
Title:Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17497)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2017)
Mar 24 2017Waiver of right of respondent Charles J. McKee, County Counsel of Monterey County, California to respond filed.
Mar 28 2017Waiver of right of respondent Alison A. Barratt-Greene, County of Nevada County, California to respond filed.
Apr 11 2017Waiver of right of respondent Christopher A. Callihan, City of Attorney for the City of Salinas, California, in his official capacity to respond filed.
Apr 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017.
Apr 20 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
May 24 2017Brief of respondents State Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Jun 01 2017Reply of petitioners Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., et al. filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 19 2017Record Requested.
Jun 19 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Katherine M. Hogan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City of Attorney
City of Salinas
200 Lincolns
Salinas, CA 93901-2639

Party name: Christopher A. Callihan, City of Attorney for the City of Salinas, California, in his official capacity
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
CA Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
415-703-2543
Party name: State Respondents
William Litt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Monterey
168 W. Alisal Street, Third Floor
Salinas, CA 93901

(831) 755-5045
Party name: Charles J. McKee, County Counsel of Monterey County, California
Amanda Uhrhammer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Nevada
950 Madiu Avenue
Suite #240
Nevada City, CA 95959

county.counsel@co.nevada.ca.us
(530) 265-1319
Party name: Alison A. Barratt-Greene, County of Nevada County, California
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.Claybrook, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
(202) 250-3833
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, Christian Legal Society, et al.