No. 16-1144
Title:Carl J. Marinello, II, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2224)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017)
Apr 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017.
Apr 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of The American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Apr 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute, at el. filed.
May 22 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 25 2017Letter of May 25, 2017, with supplemental authority from the Acting Solicitor General received.
Jun 05 2017Reply of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Jun 27 2017Petition GRANTED.
Aug 03 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2017.
Aug 03 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017.
Aug 23 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II.
Sep 01 2017Brief of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, December 5, 2017
Oct 18 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Oct 19 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. is electronic.
Oct 20 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Nov 15 2017This case is removed from the oral argument calendar for Tuesday, December 5, 2017, and has been SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 6, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Reply of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2017Argued. For petitioner: Matthew S. Hellman, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Robert A. Parker, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: Carl J. Marinello, II
Joseph M. LaTona403 Main Street
716 Brisbane Building
Buffalo, NY 14203

sandyw@tomburton.com
(716) 842-0416
Party name: Carl J. Marinello, II
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jenny Louise Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Johnson Moore LLC
150 North Wacker Drive - Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

jenny.johnson@jmtaxlitigation.com
312-549-9990
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel
Lewis Jeffrey Liman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

lliman@cgsh.com
212-225-2000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Erica Lynn Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

erica.marshall@causeofaction.org
202 499-4232
Party name: Cause of Action Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
212-257-4880
Party name: New York Council of Defense Lawyers
John J. VecchioneCause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
(202) 499-4232
Party name: Cause of Action Institute, at el.