No. 16-1140
Title:National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, dba NIFLA, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California, et al.
Docketed:March 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55249)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2017)
Apr 13 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Apr 13 2017Waiver of right of respondent Morgan Foley to respond filed.
Apr 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017.
Apr 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Liberty, Life and Law Foundation filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Freedom X and Crisis Pregnancy Clinic of Southern California filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Charlotte Lozier Institute filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Care Net filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Apr 20 2017Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. VIDED
May 24 2017Brief of respondents State Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Jun 05 2017Reply of petitioners National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, dba NIFLA, et al. filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 19 2017Record Requested.
Jun 19 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 02 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 02 2017Letter of November 2, 2017, from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Nov 02 2017Letter of November 2, 2017, from counsel for respondents received. VIDED (Distributed)
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the disclosures required by the California Reproductive FACT Act violate the protections set forth in the Free Speech Clause of the First Amendment, applicable to the States through the Fourteenth Amendment.
Nov 29 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, NIFLA, et al..
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2017Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2017Joint motion of the parties to file their opening briefs on the merits is granted and the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 8, 2018, and the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including February 20, 2018.
Dec 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2018Brief of petitioners NIFLA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Three Illinois Pregnancy Care Centers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Brief amici curiae of 13 Women and The Catholic Association Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts Citizens for Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Charlotte Lozier Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Amicus brief of Jews for Religious Liberty submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Care Net filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2018Brief amici curiae of 41 Family Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Pregnancy Care Centers in Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Human Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States Supporting Neither Party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of The Scharpen Foundation, Inc., Advocates for Faith & Freedom, and National Pro-Life Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of First Resort, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Operation Outcry, Texas Justice Foundation, and Priests for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of C12 Group, CEO Forum, Inc., Christian Employers Alliance, Marketplace Leaders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of 144 Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Mountain Right to Life, Inc., dba Pregnancy and Family Resource Center, Birth Choice of the Desert and His Nesting Place filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of American Center for Law & Justice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Freedom X and Crisis Pregnancy Clinic of Southern California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Alpha Center, A Pregnancy Help Center Registered Under the Laws of South Dakota filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Amicus brief of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Amicus brief of Heartbeat International, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Amicus brief of David Boyle submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David A. Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 1st Street N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

dcortman@adflegal.org
(202) 393-8690
Party name: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, dba NIFLA, et al.
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, NE
Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

dcortman@adflegal.org
7703390774
Party name: NIFLA, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Dale Bunton
    Counsel of Record
Office of County Counsel
1600 Pacific Highway
Room 355
San Diego, CA 92101

thomas.bunton@sdcounty.ca.gov
619-531-6456
Party name: Thomas E. Montgomery
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
CA Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
415-703-2543
Party name: State Respondents
Joshua Aaron Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
415-703-2543
Party name: Becerra, Att'y Gen. of CA, et al.
Carrie L. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
McDougal, Love, Boehmer, Foley, Lyon & Canlas
8100 La Mesa Blvd., Suite 200
La Mesa, CA 91942

cmitchell@mcdougallove.com
(619) 440-4444
Party name: Morgan Foley
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
2101 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 525
Arlington, VA 22201

Steven.Aden@aul.org
202-741-4917
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists; Christian Medical & Dental Association; American College of Pediatricians
William Becker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Freedom X
1500 Olympic Blvd.
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

freedomxlaw@gmail.com
310-636-1018
Party name: Freedom X and Crisis Pregnancy Clinic of Southern California
Dorinda C. Bordlee
    Counsel of Record
Bioethics Defense Fund
3422 Cleary Avenue
Metairie, LA 70002

dbordlee@bdfund.org
5042317234
Party name: Charlotte Lozier Institute
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Care Net
Harold J. Cassidy
    Counsel of Record
The Cassidy Law Firm
750 Broad Street
Shrewsbury, NJ 07702

hjc@haroldcassidy.com
7327473999
Party name: Alpha Center, A Pregnancy Help Center Registered Under the Laws of South Dakota
Jonathan David Christman
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200
P.O. Box 3001
Blue Bell, PA 19422

jchristman@foxrothschild.com
610-397-6500
Party name: Human Coalition
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc.
1 Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
301-503-6329
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
1001 Pa. Ave., N.W., 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, et al.
Dwight Gerard Duncan
    Counsel of Record
University of Massachusetts
School of Law
333 Faunce Corner Road
North Dartmouth, MA 02747

dduncan@umassd.edu
508-985-1124
Party name: Massachusetts Citizens for Life, et al.
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
MRD Law
620 N Tejon St
Suite 101
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

michael.francisco@mrd.law
3033257843
Party name: C12 Group, CEO Forum, Inc., Christian Employers Alliance, Marketplace Leade
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Austin French
    Counsel of Record
National Review Institute
19 West 44th Street
Suite 1701
New York, NY 10036

dfrench@nationalreview.com
931-446-7572
Party name: 41 Family Policy Organizations
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
(714) 283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
5125902655
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 West Plano Parkway
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kklukowski@firstliberty.org
(972) 941-4444
Party name: Legal Scholars
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Andrea Marie Picciotti-Bayer
    Counsel of Record
Catholic Association Foundation
3220 N. Street NW, Suite 126
Washington, DC 20007

amariepicciotti@gmail.com
5712016564
Party name: 13 Women and The Catholic Association Foundation
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

rienzi@law.edu
2025070834
Party name: First Resort, Inc.
James Christopher Rutten
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 South Grand Avenue, 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

james.rutten@mto.com
(213) 683-9189
Party name: Heartbeat International, Inc.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Duncan
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: U.S. Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206
San Antonio, TX 78230

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-697-8202
Party name: Pregnancy Care Centers in Texas
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 1313
Ojai, CA 93024-1313

lldfojai@earthlink.net
(707) 337-6880
Party name: Operation Outcry, Texas Justice Foundation, and Priests for Life
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
2400 Virginia Avenue, N.W.
Apt. C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@cooperkirk.com
954-328-9461
Party name: Jews for Religious Liberty
Noel Ward Sterett
    Counsel of Record
Mauck & Baker, LLC
One North LaSalle Street, Suite 600
Chicago, IL 60602

nsterett@mauckbaker.com
312-726-1243
Party name: Twenty-Three Illinois Pregnancy Care Centers
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
2075223163
Party name: 144 Members of Congress
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave W
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

jmorgan@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.
Robert H. Tyler
    Counsel of Record
Tyler & Bursch, LLP
24910 Las Brisas Road
Suite 110
Murrieta, CA 92562

rtyler@tylerbursch.com
9516002733
Party name: The Scharpen Foundation, Inc., Advocates for Faith & Freedom, and National Pro-Life Alliance
William J. Becker Jr.Freedom X
11500 Olympic Blvd.
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

freedomxlaw@gmail.com
(310) 636-1018
Party name: Freedom X and Crisis Pregnancy Clinic of Southern California
John J. BurschBursch Law PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley Avenue SE, #78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Care Net
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.Claybrook, LLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
(202) 250-3833
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, Christian Legal Society, et al.
Deborah Dewart620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: Liberty, Life and Law Foundation
Catherine Glenn Foster1200 New Hampshire Ave., N.W., Suite 750
Washington, DC 20036

cfoster@lozierinstitute.org
(202) 223-8073
Party name: Charlotte Lozier Institute
Jeremiah Lee MorganWilliam J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue, West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
(703)-356-5070
Party name: United States Justice Foundation, et al.
Ilya ShapiroCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202) 842-2000
Party name: Cato Institute