No. 16-1137
Title:616 Croft Ave., LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of West Hollywood, California
Docketed:March 21, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B266660)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 21, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2017)
Mar 23 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Mar 29 2017Waiver of right of respondent City of West Hollywood, California to respond filed.
Apr 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
Apr 13 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al. (Distributed)
Apr 18 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. (Distributed)
Apr 20 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Citizens' Alliance for Property Rights Legal Fund. (Distributed)
Apr 20 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence. (Distributed)
Apr 25 2017Response Requested. (Due May 25, 2017)
May 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 26, 2017.
May 25 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Scholars of Land Use Regulation.
Jun 26 2017Brief of respondent City of West Hollywood, California in opposition filed.
Jul 10 2017Reply of petitioners 616 Croft Ave., LLC, et al. filed.
Jul 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian T. Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 NE 33rd Place
Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
(425) 576-0484
Party name: 616 Croft Ave., LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey A. Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2000
Party name: City of West Hollywood, California
Michael JenkinsJenkins & Hogin, LLP
1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 110
Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

(310)-643-8448
Party name: City of West Hollywood, California
Other
Paul J. Beard1115 11th Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
(916)-498-3354
Party name: Citizens' Alliance for Property Rights Legal Fund
Anthony Thomas CasoCenter for Constitutional Jurisprudence c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman Univ.
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Andrew Michael Grossman1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
(202)-861-1697
Party name: Scholars of Land Use Regulation
Kimberly Stewart HermannSouth Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Luke Anthony WakeNFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
2023142048
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al.,
Bryan Kipp Weir3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

bryan@consovoymccarthy.com
0703-243-9423
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.