No. 16-1125
Title:Rogers Lacaze, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:March 17, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2016-KP-0234)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2017)
Apr 04 2017Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Apr 14 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Ethics Bureau at Yale.
Apr 17 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.
Apr 17 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Jury Project.
Apr 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
Apr 24 2017Response Requested.(Due May 24, 2017)
May 24 2017Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
May 30 2017Reply of petitioner Rogers Lacaze filed. (Distributed)
Jun 08 2017Record Requested.
Jun 28 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Louisiana. The record is electronic.
Jul 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange
MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
(202) 869-3434
Party name: Rogers Lacaze
Attorneys for Respondent
Donald G. Cassels III.
    Counsel of Record
Orleans Parish District Attorney's Office
619 South White Street
New Orleans, LA 70119

dscassels@orleansda.com
(504) 822-2414
Party name: Louisiana
Scott G. Vincent
    Counsel of Record
District Attorney for Parish of Orleans
619 S. White St.
New Orleans, LA 70119

svincent@orleansda.com
(504) 822-2414
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Micah J. Fincher201 St. Charles Avenue
New Orleans, LA 70170-5100

mfincher@joneswalker.com
504-582-8464
Party name: National Jury Project
Lawrence J. Fox127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
203 432 9358
Party name: The Ethics Bureau at Yale
Parker Davidson Thomson600 Brickell Avenue
Suite 2700
Miami, FL 33131

parker.thomson@hoganlovells.com
305 459 6613
Party name: Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.