No. 16-1122 | |
Title: | Edwin E. Bell, Jr., et ux., Petitioners v. Dyck-O'Neal, Inc. |
Docketed: | March 16, 2017 |
Linked with 16A776 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Special Appeals of Maryland |
Case Numbers: | (1165, September Term, 2015) |
Decision Date: | May 17, 2016 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | September 29, 2016 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 27 2017 | Application (16A776) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 21, 2017 to April 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 31 2017 | Application (16A776) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 22, 2017. |
Mar 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2017) |
Apr 06 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Dyck-O'Neal, Inc. to respond filed. |
Apr 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
May 15 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
Jun 08 2017 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Jun 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED. |
Jul 17 2017 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Edwin E. Bell Jr. | 3418 Littlestown Pike Westminster, MD 21158 | (410) 346-7575 |
Party name: Edwin E. Bell, Jr., et ux. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Thomas Jonathan Kokolis Counsel of Record | Parker, Simon & Kokolis, LLC 110 North Washington Street, Suite 500 Rockville, MD 20850 tkokolis@pskfirm.com | (301)-656-5775 |
Party name: Dyck-O'Neal, Inc. |