No. 16-1116 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Charlotte Jenkins, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Percy Hutton
Docketed:March 16, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-3968)
   Decision Date:October 12, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:December 13, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2017)
Mar 10 2017Appendix of Charlotte Jenkins, Warden filed.
Apr 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2017.
May 01 2017Brief of respondent Percy Hutton in opposition filed.
May 01 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Percy Hutton.
May 15 2017Reply of petitioner Charlotte Jenkins, Warden filed. (Distributed)
May 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 19 2017Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
Jul 14 2017Petition for Rehearing filed.
Aug 03 2017DISTRIBUTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Attorney's General
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl.
Columbus, OH 43215-3428

eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
(614) 466-8980
Party name: Charlotte Jenkins, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael J. Benza
    Counsel of Record
17850 Geauga Lake Road
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023

michael.benza@case.edu
(216) 319-1247
Party name: Percy Hutton