No. 16-111
Title:Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Colorado Civil Rights Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 25, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(14CA1351)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 25, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2016)
Aug 04 2016Waiver of right of respondents Colorado Civil Rights Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Aug 11 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 23, 2016, for all respondents.
Aug 22 2016Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation For Moral Law.
Aug 23 2016Waiver of right of respondents Charlie Craig and David Mullins to respond filed.
Aug 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Aug 31 2016Response Requested. (Due September 30, 2016)
Sep 15 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2016, for all respondents.
Nov 28 2016Brief of respondents Charlie Craig and David Mullins in opposition filed.
Nov 29 2016Brief of respondent Colorado Civil Rights Commission in opposition filed.
Dec 12 2016Reply of petitioners Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al. filed.
Dec 14 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 03 2017Rescheduled.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 10 2017Record Requested.
Jan 30 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Colorado (1 box).
Feb 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 15 2017Rescheduled.
Feb 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Apr 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 12 2017Letter of May 12, 2017, from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
May 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation For Moral Law GRANTED.
Jun 26 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2017.
Jul 12 2017The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017.
Jul 20 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party, or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 26 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Colorado Civil Rights Commission.
Aug 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Aug 31 2017Brief of petitioners Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Indiana Family Institute, Inc., et al. filed.
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Rev. Patrick Mahoney, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D., et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Independence Law Center filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Research Council filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of National Black Religious Broadcasters, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of William Jack and The National Center for Law and Policy filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Mark Regnerus, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Cake Artists in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 33 Family Policy Organizations filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of International Christian Photographers and Center for Arizona Policy filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and National Organization for Marriage filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 34 Legal Scholars filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Sherif Girgis filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Richard Lawrence filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities (CCCU), et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of C 12 Group, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Aaron and Melissa Klein filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA") filed on behalf of Orthodox Jewish Organizations filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors Christopher R. Green and David R. Upham filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Freedom X and Rabbi Dovid Bressman filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 479 Creative Professionals filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Restoring Religious Freedom Project filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Lawyers Association filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Christian Law Association filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Utah Republican State Senators filed.
Sep 20 2017Motion for leave to intervene filed by Chris Sevier, et al.
Sep 28 2017Motion for leave to intervene filed by John Gunter, Jr., et al.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT Tuesday, December 5, 2017
Oct 10 2017Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents.
Oct 20 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondent Colorado Civil Rights Commission filed. (Distributed)
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondents Charlie Craig and David Mullins filed. (Distributed)
Oct 25 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars in Support of Equality filed. (Distributed)
Oct 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Freedom of Speech Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders and American Society on Aging filed. (Distributed)
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of American Unity Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of the Constitutional Rights and Interests of Children filed. (Distributed)
Oct 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Motion of Chris Sevier, et al. for leave to intervene DENIED.
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of 15 Faith and Civil Rights Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Motion of John Gunter, Jr., et al. for leave to intervene DENIED.
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of the General Synod of the United Church of Christ, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Inquiry, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of National Women's Law Center and Other Groups filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Chefs, Bakers, and Restaurateurs filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Transgender Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Colorado Organizations and Individuals filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of OutServe-SLDN, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Floyd Abrams, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Main Street Alliance, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Thirty-Seven Businesses and Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Ilan H. Meyer, PhD, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Central Conference of American Rabbis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Corporate Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Civil Rights Forum filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor Tobias B. Wolff filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of 211 Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Representative Tony Coelho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of National LGBTQ Task Force, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Canadian Civil Liberties Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Accommodation Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Denver Metro Chamber of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Service Employees International Union filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Behavioral Science and Economics filed. (Reprinted Copy Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Tanenbaum Center for Interreligious Understanding filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of Transgender Legal Defense and Education Fund filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of County of Santa Clara, Cities of New York and Los Angeles, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 30 2017Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 21 2017Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED.
Nov 21 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 22 2017Reply of petitioners Masterpiece Cakeshop, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2017Argued. For petitioners: Kristen K. Waggoner, Scottsdale, Ariz.; and Noel J. Francisco, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For State respondent: Frederick R. Yarger, Solicitor General, Denver, Colo. For private respondents: David D. Cole, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th St.
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

kwaggoner@adflegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Masterpiece Cakeshop, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

rmar@aclu.org
212-549-2500
Party name: Charlie Craig and David Mullins
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
720 508-6000
Party name: Colorado Civil Rights Commission
Leslie Cooper125 Broad Street
18th floor
New York, NY 10004

lcooper@aclu.org
212 549 2500
Party name: Charlie Craig and David Mullins
Other
Maureen Patricia Alger
    Counsel of Record
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

malger@cooley.com
(650)-843-5000
Party name: Canadian Civil Liberties Association, et al.
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

(202)-639-6023
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
Richard C. Baker
    Counsel of Record
Mauck & Baker, LLC
1 N. LaSalle St., Suite 600
Chicago, IL 60602

rbaker@mauckbaker.com
(312)-853-8708
Party name: C 12 Group, et al.
Peter T. Barbur
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Ave.
New York, NY 10019-7475

pbarbur@cravath.com
(212) 474-1000
Party name: 211 Members of Congress
Hilarie Bass
    Counsel of Record
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

312 988 5000
Party name: American Bar Association
William J. Becker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Freedom X
11500 Olympic Blvd., Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

bill@freedomxlaw.com
310-636-1018
Party name: Freedom X and Rabbi Dovid Bressman
Michael E. Bern
    Counsel of Record
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-1021
Party name: Outserve-SLDN, Inc., et al.
Mary L. Bonauto
    Counsel of Record
30 Winter Street
Suite 800
Boston, MA 02108

mbonauto@glad.org
617-426-1350
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al.
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
812-232-2434
Party name: Indiana Family Institute, Inc., et al.
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Thomas Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
19 South LaSalle Street, Suite 603
Chicago, IL 60603

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
(312) 782-1680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Roger G. Brooks
    Counsel of Record
3804 W. Cornwallis Rd.
Durham, NC 27705

brooks3804@gmail.com
919-402-1758
Party name: American College of Pediatricians, et al.
Jon Burke
    Counsel of Record
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

jonathan.burke@state.ma.us
508-792-7600
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Bursch Law, PLLC
9339 Cherry Valley Ave. SE, Suite 78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
616-450-4235
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
1001 Pa. Ave., N.W., 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: First Amendment Lawyers Association
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

(202) 383-5300
Party name: Floyd Abrams, et al.
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Research Council
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
909-493-5706
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and National Organization for Marriage
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19109

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: 15 Faith and Civil Rights Organizations
Anna P. Engh
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLPOne CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

aengh@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: The National Women's Law Center and Other Groups
Michael K. Erickson
    Counsel of Record
Ray Quinney & Nebeker, P.C.
36 S. State Street, Suite 1400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

merickson@rqn.com
801-323-3351
Party name: Utah Republican State Senators
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
MRD Law
620 N. Tejon Street, Suite 101
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

michael.francisco@mrd.law
303-325-7843
Party name: William Jack and The National Center for Law and Policy
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Austin French
    Counsel of Record
National Review Institute
215 Lexington Ave., 11th Fl.
New York, NY 10016

dfrench@nationalreview.com
931-446-7572
Party name: 33 Family Policy Organizations
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
336-279-9331
Party name: CatholicVote.org
Robert P. George
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & McElwee, PLLC
700 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV 25301

rpg@ramlaw.com
304-344-5800
Party name: Sherif Girgis
David C. Gibbs Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs & Associates Law Firm
5412 Courseview Drive, Suite 122
Mason, OH 45040

dgibbsjr@gibbs-lawfirm.com
(513) 234-5545
Party name: Christian Law Association
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
Daniel Lawrence Greenberg
    Counsel of Record
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

daniel.greenberg@srz.com
212-756-2000
Party name: Tanenbaum Center for Interreligious Understanding
John Gunter Jr.
    Counsel of Record
5683 S. Redwood Rd.
Salt Lake City, UT 84123

techlawjohn123@gmail.com
(801) 654-5973
Party name: John Gunter, Jr.
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
(202)-508-4600
Party name: The General Synod of the United Church of Christ, et al.
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 6000
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@mofo.com
202-778-1663
Party name: National LGBTQ Task Force, et al.
Adam Wolff Hofmann
    Counsel of Record
Hanson Bridgett LLP
425 Market Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

ahofmann@hansonbridgett.com
415-777-3200
Party name: Scholars of Behavioral Science and Economics
Roberta A Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

rkaplan@kaplannandcompany.com
(212)-763-0883
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
(202)-466-3234
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center for Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane, Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
(901) 684-5485
Party name: 479 Creative Professionals
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: Ilan H. Meyer, PhD, et al.
Craig Joseph Konnoth
    Counsel of Record
425 Wolf Law Building, 401 UCB
Boulder, CO 80309-0401

craig.konnoth@colorado.edu
303-735-6397
Party name: Colorado Organizations and Individuals
David R. Langdon
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law, LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Road
West Chester, OH 45069

dlangdon@langdonlaw.com
513.577.7380
Party name: 34 Legal Scholars
Stuart J. Lark
    Counsel of Record
Sherman & Howard LLC
90 South Cascade Avenue
Suite 1500
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

slark@shermanhoward.com
(719) 448-4036
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Richard Alfred Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
608 S. Hull Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

richard@rlawrencelaw.com
334-263-2000
Party name: Richard Lawrence
Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dlaycock@virginia.edu
(434) 243-8546
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
202-828-1000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA") filed on behalf of Orthodox Jewish Organizations
Stacey Monica Leyton
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

sleyton@altber.com
(415)-421-7151
Party name: Service Employees International Union
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund
P.O. Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
(858) 759-9948
Party name: Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D., et al.
Matthew Jeffrey MacLean
    Counsel of Record
1200 Seventeenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

matthew.maclean@pillsburylaw.com
(202)663-8000
Party name: Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs, et al.
Rebecca Susan Markert
    Counsel of Record
Freedom form Religion Foundation
P.O. Box 750
Madison, WI 53701

rmarkert@ffrf.org
608-256-8900
Party name: Freedom From Religion Foundation
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
(703)-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

contact@greatlakesjc.org
517-322-3207
Party name: Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom
Thomas Patrick Monaghan
    Counsel of Record
Free Speech Advocates
6375 New Hope Road
New Hope, KY 40052

monaghanoffice@earthlink.net
502 549 5454
Party name: Rev. Patrick Mahoney, et al.
Jonathan Jacob Nadler
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 200037

jack.nadler@squirepb.com
202-457-6000
Party name: Service and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders and the American Society on Aging
Michael J. Norton
    Counsel of Record
Thomas N. Scheffel & Associates, P.C.
3801 E. Florida Ave., Suite 600
Denver, CO 80210

nmorton@tnslaw.com
303-759-5937
Party name: International Christian Photographers and Center for Arizona Policy
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
Lawrence Anthony Organ
    Counsel of Record
332 San Anselmo Avenue
San Anselmo, CA 94960

larry@civilrightsca.com
415-453-4740
Party name: Civil Rights Forum
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Jennifer C. Pizer
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
4221 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 280
Los Angeles, CA 90010

jpizer@lambdalegal.org
213-382-7600
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., et al.
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
(202)-955-0095
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Sanford Jay Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP
50 Fremont Street, 19th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105

srosen@rbgg.com
415-433-6830
Party name: Former Representative Tony Coelho, et al.
Daniel Adam Rubens
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY, NY 10019

drubens@orrick.com
212-506-5000
Party name: Corporate Law Professors
Jonathan B. Sallet
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jsallet@steptoe.com
(202) 429-8124
Party name: Thirty-Seven Businesses and Organizations
Gene C. Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Duncan LLP
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities (CCCU), et al.
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
1441 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jschnapper@naacpldf.org
202-682-1300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
David I. Schoen
    Counsel of Record
2800 Zelda Road
Suite 100-6
Montgomery, AL 36106

dschoen593@aol.com
(334)-395-6611
Party name: Restoring Religious Freedom Project
Chris Sevier
    Counsel of Record
9 Music Square South #247
Nashville, TN 37203

(615) 500-4411
Party name: Chris Sevier, et al.
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Aaron and Melissa Klein
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Chefs, Bakers, and Restaurateurs
David Allen Shaneyfelt
    Counsel of Record
The Alvearez Firm
24005 Ventura Blvd.
Calabasas,, CA 91302

dshaneyfelt@alvarezfirm.com
(818) 224-7077
Party name: Law and Economics Scholars
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Steven H. Shiffrin
    Counsel of Record
524 College Avenue, 103 Myron Taylor Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

shs6@cornell.edu
607-255-4560
Party name: Freedom of Speech Scholars
Charles Christian Sipos
    Counsel of Record
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

(206)-359-8000
Party name: Main Street Alliance, et al.
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7040
Party name: Transgender Law Center, et al.
Catherine E. Smith
    Counsel of Record
2255 E. Evans Ave.
Denver, CO 80208

c.smith@law.dv.edu
303-871-6180
Party name: Scholars of the Constitutional Rights and Interests of Children
Lisa E. Soronen
    Counsel of Record
State and Local Legal Center
444 North Capitol Street, NW
Suite 515
Washington, DC 20001

lsoronen@sso.org
202-434-4845
Party name: National League of Cities, et al.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel PO Box 540774
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
(407)-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Edward Z. Tabash
    Counsel of Record
11500 West Olympic Blvd
Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

etabash@centerforinquiry.net
310-279-5120
Party name: The Center for Inquiry, et al.
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: National Black Religious Broadcasters , et al.
Jeffrey S. Trachtman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9100
Party name: Central Conference of American Rabbis, et al.
Edward Howard Trent
    Counsel of Record
550 Main Avenue, Suite 900
P.O. Box 2231
Knoxville, TN 37922

etrent@wimberlylawson.com
(865)-546-1000
Party name: Mark Regnerus, et al.
Robert H. Tyler
    Counsel of Record
24910 Las Brisas Road
Suite 109
Murrieta, CA 92562

rtyler@tylerbursch.com
(951)-304-7583
Party name: Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod
David R. Upham
    Counsel of Record
University of Dallas, 1845 East Northgate Drive
Irving, TX 75062-4736

davidrupham@yahoo.com
(972) 721-5186
Party name: Professors Christopher R. Green and David R. Upham
Kyle C. Velte
    Counsel of Record
Texas Tech University School of Law
3311 18th Street
Box 40004
Lubbock, TX 79409

kyle.velte@tt.edu
806 834-5470
Party name: Legal Scholars in Support of Equality
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law, Supreme Court Clinic405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: American Unity Fund, et al.
John Francis Walsh
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1225 17th St., Suite 2600
Denver, CO 80202

john.walsh@wilmerhale.com
720-274-3135
Party name: Denver Metro Chamber of Commerce, et al.
Catherine Weiss
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
One Lowenstein Dr.
Roseland, NJ 07068

cweiss@lowenstein.com
973-597-2438
Party name: Public Accommodation Law Scholars
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rlwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Independence Law Center
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Ste 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

jon@whiteheadlawllc.com
816.398.8305
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Michael K. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Whitehead Law Firm, LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2600
Kansas City, MO 64105

mike@thewhiteheadfirm.com
816-398-8967
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Julie H. Wilensky
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, Santa Clara
70 W. Hedding Street, E. Wing, 9th Floor
San Jose, CA 95110

julie.wilensky@cco.sccgov.org
(408)299-5955
Party name: County of Santa Clara, Cities of New York and Los Angeles, et al.
John D. Winter
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jwinter@pbwt.com
212-336-2836
Party name: Transgender Legal Defense and Education Fund
Tobias Barrington Wolff
    Counsel of Record
3501 Sansom Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

twolff@law.upenn.edu
(215)-898-7471
Party name: Professor Tobias B. Wolff
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
(512)-322-2500
Party name: Cake Artists
Jeffrey Ira Zuckerman
    Counsel of Record
The Zuckerman Law Group LLP
1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

jzuckerman@zucklawgroup.com
202-349-3962
Party name: Agudath Israel of America