No. 16-1102
Title:Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Apple Inc.
Docketed:March 10, 2017
Linked with 16A823
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1171, 15-1195, 15-1994)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2017Application (16A823) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2017 to March 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Feb 21 2017Application (16A823) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2017.
Mar 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017)
Mar 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017.
Apr 10 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amici curiae of The Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amici curiae of The Software & Information Industry Association, et al. filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
May 22 2017Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in opposition filed.
Jun 05 2017Reply of petitioners Samsung Electronics Co., et al. filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kathleen M. Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
William F. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

william.lee@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Apple Inc.
Other
Joseph Carl CecereCecere PC
6035 McComass Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
(469) 600-9455
Party name: The Hispanic Leadership Fund, et al.
Bernard H. ChaoUniversity of Denver Sturm College of Law
2255 E. Evans Avenue
Denver, CO 80208

bchao@law.du.edu
303-871-6110
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
Charles DuanPublic Knowledge
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC 20036

cduan@publicknowledge.org
(202) 861-0020
Party name: Public Knowledge, et al.
John F. DuffyHughes, Hubbard & Reed
1775 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

john.duffy@hugheshubbard.com
(202) 721-4600
Party name: The Software & Information Industry Association, et al.