No. 16-1094
Title:Republic of Sudan, Petitioner
v.
Rick Harrison, et al.
Docketed:March 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-121-cv)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:December 9, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017)
Apr 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of United Arab Emirates filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Kingdom of Saudi Arabia filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amici curiae of International Law Professors filed.
Apr 10 2017Waiver of right of respondents Rick Harrison, et al. to respond filed.
Apr 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Government of National Accord, State of Libya filed.
Apr 13 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Republic of Sudan filed.
Apr 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
Apr 26 2017Response Requested. (Due May 26, 2017)
May 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 26, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Brief of respondents Rick Harrison, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 13 2017Reply of petitioner Republic of Sudan filed. (Distributed)
Oct 02 2017The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Jan 30 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Republic of Sudan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2018Supplemental brief of respondents Rick Harrison, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 28 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including and August 15, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 18, 2018.
Aug 10 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Rick Harrison, et al..
Blanket Consent
Aug 10 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Republic of Sudan
Blanket Consent
Aug 15 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.) (To be reprinted.)
Aug 15 2018Brief of petitioner Republic of Sudan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Joint appendix filed. (Reprinted joint appendix submitted - September 7, 2018.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 7, 2018
Aug 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Government of National Accord, State of Libya filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Kingdom of Saudi Arabia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2018Brief amici curiae of International Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Sep 11 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. The record is electronic and complete.
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 17 2018Record received from the U.S.D. C. Southern Dist. of New York. The record SEALED. ( 1 - Box)
Sep 18 2018Brief of respondents Rick Harrison, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Counterterrorism Officials, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 18 2018Reply of petitioner Republic of Sudan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Letter from respondents filed. (Distributed)
Nov 07 2018Argued. For petitioner: Christopher M. Curran, Washington, D. C.; and Erica Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202 626 3643
Party name: Republic of Sudan
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew C. Hall
    Counsel of Record
Hall Lamb and Hall & Leto, P.A.
Offices at Grand Bay Plaza
Penthouse One, 2665 South Bayshore Dr.
Miami, FL 33133

andyhall.hlhlawfirm.com
(305) 374-5030
Party name: Rick Harrison, et al.
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Rick Harrison, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Pierre H. BergeronSquire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

pierre.bergeron@squirepb.com
(202) 457-5601
Party name: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Pierre Henri Bergeron
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
201 E. Fourth St.
Suite 1900
Cincinnati, OH 45202

pierre.bergeron@squirepb.com
5133611200
Party name: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Former U.S. Counterterrorism Officials, National Security Officials, and National Security Scholars
Paul F. EnzinnaEllerman Enzinna, PLLC
1050 30th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

penzinna@ellermanenzinna.com
(202) 753-5553
Party name: Government of National Accord, State of Libya
Paul F. Enzinna
    Counsel of Record
Ellerman Enzinna PLLC
1050 30th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

Penzinna@ellermanenzinna.com
202-753-5553
Party name: Government of National Accord, State of Libya
Jared Lee Hubbard
    Counsel of Record
Fitch Law Partners LLP
One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108

jlh@fitchlp.com
6175425542
Party name: International Law Professors
Jared Lee HubbardHubb Legal, PC
29 Water St., Suite 205
Newburyport, MA 01950

jared.hubbard@hubb-legal.com
978-255-4362
Party name: International Law Professors
Guy Hamilton LoebPaul Hastings, LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

hamiltonloeb@paulhastings.com
(202) 551-1700
Party name: United Arab Emirates
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
725 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 1830
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
2139956800
Party name: Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States