No. 16-1087
Title:John Joseph Carvalho, II, Petitioner
v.
North Carolina
Docketed:March 9, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(COA14-1251)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 21, 2016
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017)
Mar 17 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Mar 23 2017Waiver of right of respondent North Carolina to respond filed.
Apr 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 05 2017Brief amici curiae of The North Carolina Advocates for Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 06 2017Response Requested.(Due May 8, 2017)
May 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 7, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed.
Jun 20 2017Reply of petitioner John Joseph Carvalho, II filed. (Distributed)
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law
Appellate Advocacy Clinic
P.O. Box 7206 Reynolda Station
Winston-Salem, NC 27109-7206

korzenjj@wfu.edu
(336) 758-5832
Party name: John Joseph Carvalho, II
Attorneys for Respondent
Derrick C. Mertz
    Counsel of Record
Special Deputy Attorney General
NC Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

dmertz@ncdoj.gov
919-716-6500
Party name: North Carolina
Other
Jonathan E. BrounNorth Carolina Prisoner Legal Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 25397
Raleigh, NC 27611

jonathan.e.broun@gmail.com
(919) 856-2200
Party name: The North Carolina Advocates for Justice, et al.