No. 16-1067
Title:Charles Murphy, Petitioner
v.
Robert Smith, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3384)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2017)
Mar 30 2017Waiver of right of respondent Robert Smith, et al. to respond filed.
Apr 03 2017Brief amici curiae of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center, et al. filed.
Apr 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
Apr 12 2017Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2017)
Apr 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2017.
Jun 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 12, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Brief of respondents Robert Smith, et al. in opposition filed.
Jul 18 2017Reply of petitioner Charles Murphy filed.
Jul 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Aug 25 2017Petition GRANTED.
Sep 05 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Charles Murphy.
Sep 29 2017Brief of petitioner Charles Murphy filed.
Oct 06 2017Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties, et al. filed.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 6, 2017
Oct 10 2017Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 20 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 30 2017Brief of respondents Robert Smith, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 06 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Michigan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 16 2017Reply of petitioner Charles Murphy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law, Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
310-206-8506
Party name: Charles Murphy
Attorneys for Respondents
David Leigh Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
100 West Randolph Street
Chicago, IL 60604

dfranklin@atg.state.il.us
(312)-814-2106
Party name: Robert Smith, et al.
Mary E. WelshAssistant Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
100 West Randolph St., 12th Fl.
Chicago, IL 60657

(312) 814-2106
Party name: Robert Smith, et al.
Other
Aaron D. Lindstrom Jr.
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

lindstromA@michigan.gov
517-373-1124
Party name: States of Michigan, et al.
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
(312)-503-1271
Party name: American Civil Liberties, et al.