No. 16-1043 | |
Title: | Jonathan R. Clark, Petitioner v. Virginia Department of State Police |
Docketed: | March 1, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Virginia |
Case Numbers: | (151857) |
Decision Date: | December 1, 2016 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 28 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2017) |
Mar 23 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 7, 2017. |
Apr 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Virginia Department of State Police in opposition filed. |
Apr 25 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. |
May 15 2017 | The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
Oct 12 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
Oct 26 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Jonathan R.Clark filed. |
Nov 01 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017. |
Nov 20 2017 | Rescheduled. |
Nov 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. |
Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Paul Graham Beers Counsel of Record | Glenn, Feldmann, Darby & Goodlatte 37 Campbell Avenue. S.W. P.O. Box 2887 Roanoke, VA 24001-2887 pbeers@glennfeldmann.com | 540-224-8000 |
Party name: Jonathan R.Clark | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Trevor Stephen Cox Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 202 North Ninth Street Richmond, VA 23219 tcox@oag.state.va.us | (804) 786-7704 |
Party name: Virginia Department of State Police | ||
Other | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |