No. 16-1027
Title:Ryan Austin Collins, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:February 24, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(151277)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:November 22, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2017)
Mar 20 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Mar 27 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Justice Foundation, et al. filed.
Apr 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 12 2017Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2017)
Apr 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed.
Jun 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Reply of petitioner Ryan Austin Collins filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew A. Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
(804) 775-4716
Party name: Ryan Austin Collins
Attorneys for Respondent
Trevor Stephen Cox
    Counsel of Record
Offic of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

tcox@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7704
Party name: Virginia
Matthew Robert McGuireOffice of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia
Other
Robert Jeffrey OlsonWilliam J. Olson PC
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: United States Justice Foundation, et al.