No. 16-1011
Title:WesternGeco LLC, Petitioner
v.
ION Geophysical Corporation
Docketed:February 17, 2017
Linked with 16A576
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2013-1527, 2014-1121, 2014-1526, 2014-1528)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2016Application (16A576) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2016 to February 17, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Dec 13 2016Application (16A576) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 17, 2017.
Feb 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2017)
Mar 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 19, 2017.
Apr 19 2017Brief of respondent ION Geophysical Corporation in opposition filed.
May 08 2017Reply of petitioner WesternGeco LLC filed.
May 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: WesternGeco LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
David J. Healey
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson P.C.
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77010

healey@fr.com
(713) 654-5300
Party name: ION Geophysical Corporation