No. 16-1009
Title:Murat Aksu, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:February 17, 2017
Linked with 16A673
Lower Ct:Superior Court of California Ventura County
   Case Numbers:(2010021861)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 20, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 06 2017Application (16A673) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2017 to February 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jan 09 2017Application (16A673) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 17, 2017.
Feb 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2017)
Feb 23 2017Waiver of right of respondent California to respond filed.
Mar 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 15 2017Response Requested. (Due April 14, 2017)
Apr 11 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
Apr 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Association for Public Defense filed.
May 12 2017Brief of respondent California in opposition filed.
May 26 2017Reply of petitioner Murat Aksu filed.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 09 2017Record Requested.
Jul 05 2017Record received from the Superior Court of California Ventura County (1 box including confidential/sealed materials).
Jul 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Strauss
    Counsel of Record
1111 East 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60637

d-strauss@uchicago.edu
(773) 834-3189
Party name: Murat Aksu
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael D. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Ventura County DA's Office
800 South Victoria Ave., Suite 314
Ventura, CA 93009

michael.schwartz@ventura.org
(805) 654-2500
Party name: California
Other
David H. TennantNixon Peabody LLP
1300 Clinton Square
Rochester, NY 14618

dtennant@nixonpeabody.com
(585)-263-1021
Party name: The National Association for Public Defense