No. 15-680
Title:Golden Bethune-Hill, et al., Appellants
v.
Virginia State Board of Elections, et al.
Docketed:November 23, 2015
Linked with 16A887
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(3:14-cv-852)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2015Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 23, 2015)
Dec 04 2015Waiver of right of appellees Virginia State Board of Elections, et al. to respond filed.
Dec 22 2015Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Virginia House of Delegates, and Speaker William J. Howell.
Dec 30 2015Reply of appellants Golden Bethune-Hill, et al., Appellants filed.
Jan 06 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016.
Jan 11 2016Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of Virginia.
Jan 13 2016Record Requested.
Jan 21 2016Record received from the USDC-Eastern District of Virginia (3 boxes). The remainder of the record is electronic and available on PACER.
Jan 27 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016.
Feb 22 2016Supplemental brief of appellants Golden Bethune-Hill, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Feb 23 2016Supplemental brief of appellees Virginia House of Delegates, and Speaker William J. Howell filed. (Distributed)
May 23 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016.
May 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016.
Jun 06 2016PROBABLE JURISDICTION NOTED.
Jun 23 2016Record from U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Virginia has been returned.
Jun 30 2016The time to file the joint appendix and appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 7, 2016.
Jun 30 2016The time to file appellees' and intervenor-appellees' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 7, 2016.
Sep 07 2016Joint appendix filed. (6 Volumes)
Sep 07 2016Brief of appellants Golden Bethune-Hill, et al. filed.
Sep 09 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support, of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for Appellants.
Sep 13 2016Brief amicus curiae of OneVirginia2021: Virginians for Fair Redistricting filed.
Sep 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting vacatur in part and affirmance in part filed.
Sep 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Sep 14 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for Appellees.
Sep 14 2016Brief amici curiae of NAACP and Virginia NAACP filed.
Sep 14 2016Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed.
Sep 14 2016Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law in support of neither party filed.
Oct 03 2016Extension of time within which to file appellees' and intervenor-appellees' brief on the merits to and including October 17, 2016.
Oct 12 2016Letter from counsel for Defendants-Appellees, Virginia State Board of Elections, et al., notifying the Clerk they will not file a separate brief on the merits.
Oct 17 2016Brief of appellees Virginia House of Delegates, and Speaker William J. Howell filed.
Oct 20 2016Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, and the Center for Equal Opportunity filed.
Oct 21 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 5, 2016
Oct 21 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 24 2016Brief amici curiae of Political Scientists Thomas L. Brunell, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 24 2016Brief amici curiae of National Black Chamber of Commerce and The Hispanic Leadership Fund filed. (Distributed)
Oct 24 2016Lodging proposal from amici National Black Chamber of Commerce and the Hispanic Leadership Fund to lodge copies of a report (the "Lowen Report"), excerpts of which are include in the appendix to their amici brief.
Oct 26 2016CIRCULATED.
Nov 01 2016Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of Virginia.
Nov 04 2016Letter from Appellants opposing National Black Chamber of Commerce and the Hispanic Leadership Fund's proposed lodging.
Nov 04 2016Records received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of Virginia is electronic and located on PACER. Also received are 3 boxes of Trial Exhibits.
Nov 14 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 16 2016Reply of appellants Golden Bethune-Hill, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 05 2016Argued. For appellants: Mark E. Elias, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Irv Gornstein, Counselor to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.
Mar 01 2017Adjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part.
Mar 10 2017Application (16A887) to issue the judgment forthwith, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Mar 14 2017Response Requested by Justice Kennedy due no later than Thursday, March 16, 2017.
Mar 16 2017Response to application from respondent Virginia House of Delegates and Speaker William J. Howell filed.
Mar 20 2017Application (16A887) denied by Justice Kennedy.
Mar 27 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Marc E. Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
(202) 654-6200
Party name: Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates and Speaker William J. Howell
Stuart A. Raphael
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

sraphael@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia State Board of Elections, Virginia Department of Elections, and James B. Alcorn, Edgardo Cortes, Clara Belle Wheeler, and Singleton B. McAllister, in their official capacities
Efrem M. BradenBaker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
(202) 861-1504
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates, and Speaker William J. Howell
Other
Jessica Ring AmunsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, et al.
Michael B. de Leeuw45 Broadway, Suite 1600
New York, NY 10006

mdeleeuw@cozen.com
(212) 908-1331
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law in support of neither party
Anita S. EarlsSouthern Coalition for Social Justice
1415 W. NC Highway 54, Suite 101
Durham, NC 27707

anita@scsj.org
(919) 794-4198
Party name: NAACP and Virginia NAACP
Noel J. FranciscoUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Irv GornsteinDepartment of Justice
Washington, DC null

(202) 514-2201
Party name: United States
Brianne Jenna GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Marguerite Mary LeoniParrinello Gross & Leoni LLP
2350 Kerner Blvd. Ste.250
San Rafael, CA 94901

mleoni@nmgovlaw.com
(415) 389-6800
Party name: Political Scientists Thomas L. Brunell, et al.
Gregory E. Lucyk300 Seneca Road
Richmond, VA 23226

gglucy@comcast.net
(804) 920-7031
Party name: OneVirginia2021: Virginians for Fair Redistricting
John J. Park Jr.Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678) 347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, and the Center for Equal Opportunity
Jason Brett TorchinskyHoltzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky, PLLC
45 North Hill Drive, Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
(540)-341-8808
Party name: National Black Chamber of Commerce and The Hispanic Leadership Fund