No. 15-606
Title:Miguel Angel Pena-Rodriguez, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:November 10, 2015
Linked with 15A265
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(13SC9)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:June 15, 2015
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2015Application (15A265) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 13, 2015 to November 12, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 10 2015Application (15A265) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 12, 2015.
Nov 10 2015Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2015)
Nov 12 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 13 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Nov 16 2015Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed.
Dec 02 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Dec 08 2015Response Requested.(Due January 7, 2016)
Dec 08 2015Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed.
Dec 10 2015Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Dec 10 2015Brief amici curiae of Professors of Law filed.
Dec 10 2015Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Dec 21 2015Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 19, 2016.
Jan 07 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Jan 07 2016Brief amici curiae of Retired Judges filed.
Feb 19 2016Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Mar 07 2016Reply of petitioner Miguel Angel Pena-Rodriguez filed.
Mar 09 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016.
Mar 28 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 1, 2016.
Apr 04 2016Petition GRANTED.
Apr 22 2016The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 23, 2016.
Apr 22 2016The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2016.
May 04 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
May 11 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Jun 23 2016Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Jun 23 2016Brief of petitioner Miguel Angel Pena-Rodriguez filed.
Jun 24 2016Brief amicus curiae of The United Mexican States filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amici curiae of Professors of Law filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of Professor Cedric Merlin Powell filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amici curiae of the Hispanic National Bar Association, et al. filed.
Jun 30 2016Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Jul 13 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 11, 2016.
Jul 22 2016Record requested from the Supreme Court of Colorado.
Aug 19 2016CIRCULATED.
Aug 29 2016Brief of respondent Colorado filed. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 06 2016Brief amicus curiae of Colorado District Attorneys' Council filed. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2016Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 06 2016Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Sep 14 2016Record received from the Supreme Court of Colorado. 1 Envelope partially SEALED and electronic.
Sep 19 2016Reply of petitioner Miguel Angel Pena-Rodriguez filed. (Distributed)
Sep 26 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 11 2016Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. For respondent: Frederick R. Yarger, Solicitor General, Denver, Colo.; and Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Mar 06 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J. and Thomas, J., joined.
Apr 07 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Apr 07 2017MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 07 2017Record from the Supreme Court of Colorado has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Miguel Angel Pena-Rodriguez
Attorneys for Respondent
Frederick R. Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Judicial Center
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
(720) 508-6168
Party name: Colorado
Other
R. Reeves AndersonArnold & Porter LLP
370 Seventeenth Street
Suite 4400
Denver, CO 80202

Reeves.Anderson@aporter.com
(303) 863-1000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Junis L. BaldonFrost Brown Todd LLC
400 West Market Street, 32nd Floor
Louisville, KY 40202-3363

jbaldon@fbtlaw.com
(502) 589-5400
Party name: Professor Cedric Merlin Powell
David A. BarrettBoies Schiller & Flexner LLP
535 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 19922

dbarrett@bsfllp
(212) 446-2300
Party name: Center for the Administration of Criminal Law
David A. BarrettBoies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP
575 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dbarrett@bsfllp.com
(212) 446-2300
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law
William S. ConsovoyConsovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington , VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Colorado District Attorneys' Council
Thomas M. FisherIGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204

Tom.Fisher@atg.in.gov
(317) 232-6255
Party name: Indiana, et al.
Noel J. FranciscoUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Nancy Gertner51 Abbottsford Road
Brookline, MA 02446

ngertner@law.harvard.edu
(617) 851-3812
Party name: Retired Judges
Marc A. GoldmanMassey & Gail
1325 G Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mgoldman@masseygail.com
(202) 652-4511
Party name: Professors of Law
Brianne Jenna GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Matthew S. HellmanJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., N.W, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
(202) 639-6861
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Peter KaranjiaDavis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

peterkaranjia@dwt.com
(202) 973-4200
Party name: the Hispanic National Bar Association, et al.
Rachel Peter Kovner950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530

rachel.kovner@usdoj.gov
(202) 514-8469
Party name: United States
Gregory J. KuykendallKuykendall & Associates
531 South Convent Avenue
Tucson, AZ 85701

greg@kuykendall-law.com
(520) 792-8033
Party name: The United Mexican States
John Paul Schnapper-CasterasNAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund
1444 I Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

jschnapper@naacpldf.org
(202) 682-1300
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Virginia A. SeitzSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

vseitz@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Kymberlee Claire StapletonCriminal Justice Legal Foundation
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

briefs@cjlf.org
916-446-0345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation