No. 15-577
Title:Trinity Lutheran Church of Columbia, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Carol S. Comer, Director, Missouri Department of Natural Resources
Docketed:November 5, 2015
Linked with 16A78
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1382)
   Decision Date:May 29, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2015
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2015Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2015)
Dec 03 2015Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Dec 07 2015Brief amici curiae of Association of Christian Schools International, and Lutheran Church - Missouri Synod filed.
Dec 07 2015Brief amicus curiae of The American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Dec 07 2015Brief amici curiae of Nevada, et al. filed.
Dec 07 2015Brief of respondent Sara Parker Pauley, Director, Missouri Department of Natural Resources in opposition filed.
Dec 07 2015Brief amicus curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission filed.
Dec 07 2015Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. (Distributed)
Dec 18 2015Reply of petitioner Trinity Lutheran Church of Columbia, Inc. filed.
Dec 22 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016Petition GRANTED.
Feb 09 2016The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including April 14, 2016.
Feb 09 2016The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 28, 2016.
Mar 17 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Apr 14 2016Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Apr 14 2016Brief of petitioner Trinity Lutheran Church of Columbia, Inc. filed.
Apr 18 2016Brief amicus curiae of World Vision, Inc. filed.
Apr 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of The American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Apr 20 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed.
Apr 20 2016Brief amicus curiae of Justice and Freedom Fund filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of American Jewish Committee in support of neither party filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Association of Christian Schools International, and Lutheran Church - Missouri Synod filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Bronx Household of Faith filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Christian Schools filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Douglas County School District, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Evangelicals filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Nevada, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The General Council of the Assemblies of God filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Belmont Abbey College filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Law and Religion Practitioners filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of Colorado filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Liberty Counsel, et al. filed.
Apr 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of WallBuilders, Inc. filed.
Jun 28 2016Brief of respondent Sara Parker Pauley, Director, Missouri Department of Natural Resources filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Religious and Civil Rights Organizations filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Legal and Religious Historians filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty and General Synod of The United Church of Christ filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amicus curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. filed.
Jul 05 2016Brief amicus curiae of The National Education Association filed.
Jul 22 2016Application (16A78) to extend the time to file a reply brief from July 28, 2016 to August 12, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jul 25 2016Application (16A78) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 12, 2016.
Aug 12 2016Reply of petitioner Trinity Lutheran Church of Columbia, Inc. filed.
Feb 17 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, April 19, 2017.
Feb 24 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Mar 02 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit (1 box).
Mar 02 2017CIRCULATED.
Apr 14 2017Request from the Clerk that the parties submit their views on whether this case is affected by the press release relating to access to Missouri grant programs issued by Governor Greitens on April 13, 2017. The parties' views should be in the form of a letter delivered to the Court and served upon counsel by noon on Tuesday, April 18, 2017.
Apr 18 2017Letter of petitioner pursuant to April 14, 2017 request of Clerk filed. (Distributed)
Apr 18 2017Letter of respondent pursuant to April 14, 2017 request of Clerk filed. (Distributed)
Apr 19 2017Argued. For petitioner: David A. Cortman, Lawrenceville, Ga. For respondent: James R. Layton, Jefferson City, Mo.
Jun 26 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, except as to footnote 3. Kennedy, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined that opinion in full, and Thomas and Gorsuch, JJ., joined except as to footnote 3. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed an opinion concurring in part, in which Thomas, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined.
Jul 28 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 07 2017Record from the U.S.C.A. for the Eight Circuit has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 1st Street N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

dcortman@adflegal.org
(202) 393-8690
Party name: Trinity Lutheran Church of Columbia, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
James R. Layton
    Counsel of Record
Tueth Keeney Cooper Mohan Jackstadt P.C.
34 N. Meramec Ave., Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63105

jlayton@tuethkeeney.com
(314) 880-3619
Party name: Carol S. Comer, Director, Missouri Department of Natural Resources
James R. LaytonOffice of the Attorney General
P. O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

james.layton@ago.mo.gov
(573) 751-1800
Party name: Carol S. Comer, Director, Missouri Department of Natural Resources
Other
Michael E. BindasInstitute for Justice
10500 N.E. 8th Street
Suite 1760
Bellevue, WA 98004

mbindas@ij.org
(425) 646-9300
Party name: Institute for Justice
Paul D. ClementKirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Douglas County School District, et al.
Kimberlee Wood ColbyChristian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
(703) 894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
Douglas R. CoxGibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

dcox@gibsondunn.com
(202) 530-9539
Party name: Association of Christian Schools International, et al.
Nathan J DiamentUnion of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
820 First Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

ouadc@ou.org
(202) 513-6484
Party name: The Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
John A. EidsmoeFoundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral
Steven W. FitschenThe National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: WallBuilders, Inc.
Michael Lee FranciscoMRDLaw
3301 West Clyde PLace
Denver, CO 80211

michael.francisco@mrd.law
(303) 325-7843
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission
Jared O. FreedmanJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jfreedman@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Mark F. Hearne II.Arent Fox LLP
112 S. Hanley Rd., Suite 200
Clayton, MO 63105

thor@arentfox.com
(314) 296-4000
Party name: National Association 0f Evangelicals
James L. Hirsen505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 208
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

hirsen@earthlink.net
(714) 283-8880
Party name: Justice and Freedom Fund
K. Hollyn HollmanBaptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty
200 Maryland Ave. NE.
Washington, DC 20002

(202) 544-4226
Party name: Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty and General Synod of The United Church of Christ
Meriem L. HubbardPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

mlh@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Joseph J. LoBueFried Frank Harris Shriver & Jacobson
801 17th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Joseph.LoBlue@friedfrank.com
(202)-639-7000
Party name: Belmont Abbey College
C. Kevin MarshallJones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

ckmarshall@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance
Matthew T. Martens1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: American Associationof Christian Schools
Eric D. McArthurSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

emcarthur@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Michael W. McConnell559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mcconnell@law.stanford.edu
(650) 736-1326
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Douglas B. MishkinVenable LLP
575 7th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

dbmishkin@venable.com
(202) 344-4000
Party name: Legal and Religious Historians
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Religious and Civil Rights Organizations
Darryl P. Rains755 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304

DRains@mofo.com
(650) 813-5600
Party name: The General Council of the Assemblies of God
Glenn E. Roper1300 Broadway, 10th floor
Denver, CO 80203

glenn.roper@coag.gov
720-508-6562
Party name: Colorado
Allison Jones Rushing725 Twelfth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

ajones@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: The Bronx Household of Faith
Gene C. SchaerrSchaerr l Duncan, LLP
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
(202) 787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities, et al.
David I. Schoen2800 Zelda Road
Suite 100-6
Montgomery, AL 36106

dschoen593@aol.com
(334) 395-6611
Party name: Law and Religion Practitioners
Jay Alan SekulowAmerican Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Ave., N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: The American Center for Law & Justice
Jay Alan SekulowAmerican Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, NE
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Ilya ShapiroCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202) 842-2000
Party name: The Cato Institute
Mathew D. StaverLiberty Counsel
P.O. Box 540774
Orlando, FL 327854

court@lc.org
(800) 671-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel, et al.
Marc D. SternAmerican Jewish Committee
165 East 56th Street
New York, NY 10022

sternm@ajc.org
(212) 891-1480
Party name: American Jewish Committee in support of neither party
Aaron M. StreettBaker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
(713) 229-1855
Party name: Members of Congress
Camilla B. TaylorLambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
105 W. Adams Street
Suite 2600
Chicago, IL 60603

ctaylor@lambdalegal.org
(312) 663-4413
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
Lawrence VanDykeOffice of the Attorney General
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

LVanDyke@ag.nv.gov
(775) 684-1100
Party name: Nevada, et al.
Eugene VolokhScott & Cyan Banister
First Amendment Clinic
UCLA School of Law 405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
(310) 206-3926
Party name: World Vision, Inc.
John M. West805 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jwest@bredhoff.com
(202) 842-2600
Party name: The National Education Association