No. 15-513
Title:State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Cori Rigsby, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-60160)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2015
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2015Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2015)
Nov 20 2015Brief of respondents United States, ex rel. Cori Rigsby, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 20 2015Brief amicus curiae of The American Tort Reform Association filed.
Nov 20 2015Brief amicus curiae of The Academy Advisors filed.
Nov 20 2015Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Nov 20 2015Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Nov 20 2015Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Nov 30 2015Reply of petitioner State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed.
Dec 02 2015DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 15 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Apr 25 2016Supplemental brief of petitioner State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed.
May 03 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 23 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016.
May 31 2016Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jun 17 2016The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 29, 2016.
Jun 17 2016The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 12, 2016.
Jul 22 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondents.
Jul 29 2016Joint appendix filed. (3 volumes).
Jul 29 2016Brief of petitioner State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed.
Jul 29 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Aug 05 2016Brief amici curiae of The American Tort Reform Association, et al. filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement filed.
Aug 05 2016Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Sep 02 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, November 1, 2016
Sep 09 2016Record has been requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2016Brief of respondents United States, ex rel. Cori Rigsby, et al. filed.
Sep 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Whistleblower Center filed.
Sep 19 2016Received from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Mississippi. (7 Boxes) a portion of the record is SEALED.
Sep 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed.
Sep 19 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 28 2016CIRCULATED
Oct 11 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 12 2016Reply of petitioner State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed. (Distributed)
Nov 01 2016Argued. For petitioner: Kathleen M. Sullivan, New York, N. Y. For respondents: Tejinder Singh, Bethesda, Md.; and John F. Bash, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Dec 06 2016Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
Jan 09 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 07 2017Record from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Mississippi has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sheila L. Birnbaum
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart
& Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

sheilabirnbaum@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Kathleen M. SullivanQuinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Attorneys for Respondents
William E. Copley
    Counsel of Record
Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

wcopley@wmclaw..com
(202) 499-7900
Party name: United States, ex rel. Cori Rigsby, et al.
Tejinder SinghGoldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202)-362-0636
Party name: United States, ex rel. Cori Rigsby, et al.
Other
Cory L. AndrewsWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
(202)-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, and Allied Educational Foundation
John F. BashDepartment of Justice
Washington, DC 20530

Party name: United States
Lawrence S. EbnerCapital Appellate Advocacy, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
(202) 729-6337
Party name: DRI-The Voice of The Defense Bar
Jessica L. EllsworthHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: The American Tort Reform Association, et al.
Ian Heath GershengornUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Jeffrey T. GreenSidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Dan HimmelfarbMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3035
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement
Stephen M. KohnKohn Kohn & Colapinto, LLP
3233 P Street, NW
Washington, DC 20007

sk@kkc.com
(202) 342-6980
Party name: National Whistleblower Center
Robert A. Long Jr.Covington & Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004-2401

rlong@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
James C. MartinReed Smith LLP
225 Fifth Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

jcmartin@reedsmith.com
(412) 288-3131
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Frederick M. Morgan Jr.Morgan Verkamp LLC
35 East 7th Street, Suite 600
Cincinnati, OH 45202

rmorgan@morganverkamp.com
(513) 651-4400
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund
David W. O'BrienCrowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

dobrien@crowell.com
(202) 624-2500
Party name: The Academy Advisors