No. 15-1509
Title:U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee, By and Through CWCapital Asset Management LLC, Petitioner
v.
The Village at Lakeridge, LLC
Docketed:June 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-60038, 13-60039)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2016)
Jul 12 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 15, 2016, for all respondents.
Aug 15 2016Brief of respondent The Village at Lakeridge, LLC in opposition filed.
Aug 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 03 2016The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Feb 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Feb 28 2017Reply of petitioner U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee, et al. filed.
Mar 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Apr 21 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 12, 2017.
Apr 21 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2017.
Jun 12 2017Joint appendix filed.
Jun 12 2017Brief of petitioner U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee, et al. filed.
Aug 11 2017Brief of respondent The Village at Lakeridge, LLC filed.
Aug 18 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Aug 18 2017Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Aug 31 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 31, 2017.
Sep 07 2017CIRCULATED
Sep 11 2017Reply of petitioners U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 12 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Sep 25 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 31 2017Argued. For petitioners: Gregory A. Cross, Baltimore, Md. For respondents: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex.; and Morgan Goodspeed, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory A. Cross
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
750 E. Pratt Street, Suite 900
Suite 900
Baltimore, MD 21202

gacross@venable.com
(410) 244-7725
Party name: U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
6688 N. Central Expy., Suite 1650
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@strismaher.com
214-396-6634
Party name: The Village at Lakeridge, LLC
Alan R. Smith505 Ridge Street
Reno, NV 89501

(775) 786-4579
Party name: The Village at Lakeridge, LLC
Other
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: the United States