No. 15-1500
Title:Brian Lewis, et al., Petitioners
v.
William Clarke
Docketed:June 13, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(19464)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2016)
Jul 13 2016Brief of respondent William Clarke in opposition filed.
Jul 26 2016Reply of petitioners Brian Lewis, et al. filed.
Jul 27 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 29 2016Petition GRANTED.
Oct 07 2016Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Brian Lewis, et al.
Oct 31 2016Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 14 2016Brief of petitioners Brian Lewis, et al. filed.
Nov 18 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent.
Nov 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States, supporting reversal filed.
Nov 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Connecticut Trial Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Dec 05 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 9, 2017.
Dec 07 2016Record requested from the Supreme Court of Connecticut.
Dec 12 2016CIRCULATED.
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondent William Clarke filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Record received from the Supreme Court of Connecticut. (1 Envelope)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Seminole Tribe of Florida, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of The National Congress of American Indians, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of The State of Arizona and the State of Oregon filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of Ninth and Tenth Circuit Tribes filed. (Distributed)
Dec 21 2016Brief amici curiae of The Otoe-Missouria Tribe of Indians, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Dec 30 2016Reply of petitioners Brian Lewis, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 09 2017Argued. For petitioners: Eric D. Miller, Seattle, Wash. For United States, as amicus curiae: Ann O'Connell, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C.
Apr 25 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Breyer, Alito, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., and Ginsburg, J., filed opinions concurring in the judgment. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
May 30 2017MANDATE ISSUED.
May 30 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 07 2017Record from the Supreme Court of Connecticut has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric D. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie, LLP
1201 Third Ave., Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

emiller@perkinscoie.com
(206) 359-8000
Party name: Brian Lewis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: William Clarke
Daniel J. KrischHalloran & Sage LLP
One Goodwin Square
225 Asylum Street
Hartford, CT 06103

krisch@halloransage.com
(860) 522-6103
Party name: William Clarke
Other
Ian Robert BarkerDentons, US, LLP
One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

ian.barker@dentons.com
0415-2674000
Party name: Ninth and Tenth Circuit Tribes
Dana Marie HrelicHorton
Shields & Knox PC
90 Gillett Street
Hartford, CT 06105

dhrelic@hortonshieldsknox.com
860-522-8338
Party name: Connecticut Trial Lawyers Association, et al.
Ann O'ConnellOffice of the Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530

aoconnell123@gmail.com
(202)-514-3385
Party name: United States
Richard G. VerriRoseette, LLP
1100 H. Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 85225

rverri@rosettelaw.com
(202) 652-0579
Party name: The Otoe-Missouria Tribe of Indians, et al.
Jeffrey B. WallUnited States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Joseph H. WebsterHobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP
2120 L Street, NW Suite 700
Washington, DC 20037

JWebster@hobbsstraus.com
(202) 822-8282
Party name: Seminole Tribe of Florida, et al.
Jennifer H. WeddleGreenberg Traurig, LLP
1200 17th Street, Suite 2400
Denver, CO 80202

weddlej@gtlaw.com
(303) 572-6500
Party name: The National Congress of American Indians, et al.