No. 15-1485
Title:District of Columbia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Theodore Wesby, et al.
Docketed:June 8, 2016
Linked with 15A1050, 16A956
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-7127)
   Decision Date:September 2, 2014
   Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2016Application (15A1050) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2016 to June 8, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 13 2016Application (15A1050) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 8, 2016.
Jun 08 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 8, 2016)
Jun 28 2016Waiver of right of respondents Theodore Wesby, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 08 2016Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by International Municipal Lawyers Association, Inc.
Jul 08 2016Brief amici curiae of Utah and Seventeen Other States filed.
Jul 13 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Jul 18 2016Response Requested. (Due August 17, 2016)
Aug 08 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 16, 2016.
Sep 16 2016Brief of respondents Theodore Wesby, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 04 2016Reply of petitioners District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Oct 05 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016.
Oct 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2016.
Nov 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016.
Nov 14 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 28 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016.
Dec 05 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Dec 27 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Jan 19 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by International Municipal Lawyers Association, Inc. GRANTED.
Jan 19 2017Petition GRANTED.
Feb 17 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 5, 2017.
Feb 17 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 12, 2017.
Apr 05 2017Application (16A956) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from August 11, 2017 to September 1, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 12 2017Application (16A956) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file the reply brief on the merits until September 1, 2017.
May 05 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
May 05 2017Brief of petitioners District of Columbia, et al. filed.
May 11 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Counties, et al. filed.
May 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
May 12 2017Brief amici curiae of Utah and Twenty-Five Other States filed.
May 22 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Jul 12 2017Brief of respondents Theodore Wesby, et al. filed.
Jul 19 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 4, 2017.
Jul 19 2017Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Aug 01 2017Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Aug 09 2017CIRCULATED
Aug 21 2017Record received from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit is electronic and available on PACER with the exception of one restricted document that is electronic.
Aug 25 2017Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Sep 01 2017Reply of petitioners District of Columbia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 04 2017Argued. For petitioners: Todd Kim, Solicitor General, Washington, D. C.; and Robert A. Parker, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Nathaniel P. Garrett, San Francisco, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Todd Sunhwae Kim
    Counsel of Record
441 4th Street, NW
Suite 600 South
Washington, DC 20001

todd.kim@dc.gov
(202)-724-6609
Party name: District of Columbia , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nathaniel Peardon Garrett
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ngarrett@jonesday.com
415-626-3939
Party name: Theodore Wesby, et al.
Gregory L. LattimoreLaw Offices of Gregory L. Lattimore, PLLC
1200 G Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

(202) 434-4513
Party name: Theodore Wesby, et al.
Ted J. WilliamsLaw Offices of Gregory L. Lattimer, PLLC
1200 G Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

lattlaw@aol.com
(202) 434-4513
Party name: Theodore Wesby, et al.
Other
Kymberly Kathryn EvansonPacifica Law Group, LLP
1191 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98101

Kymberly.evanson@pacificalawgroup.com
206.245.1700
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association Inc.
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Tyler R. GreenSolicitor General
350 N. State Street
Suite 230, P.O. Box 142320
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Utah and Seventeen other States
John J. KorzenWake Forest University School of Law
Appellate Advocacy Clinic
P.O. Box 7206 Reynolda Station
Winston-Salem, NC 27109-7206

korzenjj@wfu.edu
(336) 758-5832
Party name: The National Association of Counties, et al.
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.