No. 15-1439
Title:Cyan, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al.
Docketed:May 27, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A146891)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 24, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 27, 2016)
Jun 17 2016Waiver of right of respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al. to respond filed.
Jun 27 2016Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 27 2016Brief amici curiae of Law Professors, Elizabeth Cosenza, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 29 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Jul 01 2016Response Requested. (Due August 1, 2016)
Jul 20 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 24, 2016.
Aug 24 2016Brief of respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 07 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 08 2016Reply of petitioners Cyan, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 03 2016The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Jun 05 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Cyan, Inc., et al. filed.
Jun 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 06 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 26 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017.
Jun 27 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jul 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al.
Aug 03 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2017.
Aug 03 2017The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 13, 2017.
Aug 11 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners Cyan, Inc., et al.
Aug 28 2017Brief of petitioners Cyan, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 28 2017Joint appendix filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amicus curiae of New York Stock Exchange LLC filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Alibaba Group Holding Limited, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Business Roundtable, et al. filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Former SEC Commissioners filed.
Sep 05 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Oct 06 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, November 28, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Brief of respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al. filed.
Oct 18 2017Record requested from the Court of Appeal of California First Appellate District.
Oct 19 2017CIRCULATED
Oct 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Institutional Investors filed. (Distributed)
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Federal Jurisdiction and Securities Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Oct 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association filed. (Distributed)
Oct 20 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Nov 06 2017Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. IN PART, and the time is to be divided as follows: 30 minutes for petitioners, 25 minutes for respondents, and 10 minutes for the Solicitor General.
Nov 09 2017Record received from the Court of Appeal of California First Appellate District Division. (1 envelope), also part of the record is electronic.
Nov 13 2017Reply of petitioners Cyan, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2017Supplemental brief of respondents Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al. filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2017Supplemental Brief of Cyan, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 27 2017Letter to Clerk of Court of Cyan, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main Document
Nov 28 2017Argued. For petitioners: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae, in support of affirmance: Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Bethesda, Md.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Boris Feldman
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
650 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

boris.feldman@wsgr.com
650-493-9300
Party name: Cyan, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al.
Andrew S. LoveRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
Post Montgomery Center
One Montgomery St., Suite 1800
San Francisco, CA 94104

alove@rgrdlaw.com
(415) 288-4545
Party name: Beaver County Employees Retirement Fund, et al.
Other
James Connolly Dugan
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
(212)-728-8000
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.
John Charles Dwyer
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

650-843-5000
Party name: Law Professors
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Institutional Investors
Jared Mitchell Gerber
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton, LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

jgerber@cgsh.com
212-225-2000
Party name: Former SEC Commissioners
Douglas Wesley Greene
    Counsel of Record
Lane Powell, PC
1420 5th Avenue, Suite 4200
Seattle, WA 98101

greened@lanepowell.com
206-223-6103
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
James Glenn Kreissman
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
2475 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

jkreissman@stblaw.com
650 251 5000
Party name: Alibaba Group Holding Limited, et al.
Mary Massaron
    Counsel of Record
Plunkett Cooney
38505 Woodward Ave.
Suite 100
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com
248-901-4000
Party name: DRI - The Voice of the Defense Bar
Edmund Polubinski
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

edmund.polubinski@davispolk.com
(212)-450-4000
Party name: Business Roundtable, et al.
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
(713)-229-1234
Party name: New York Stock Exchange LLC
James C. DuganWillkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

jdugan@willkie.com
(212) 728-8000
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al.
Tower C. Snow Jr.Cooley, LLP
101 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

(415) 693-2000
Party name: Law Professors, Elizabeth Cosenza, et al.