No. 15-1406
Title:The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Petitioner
v.
Leroy Haeger, et al.
Docketed:May 19, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-17718, 13-16801, 13-16861, 13-16862)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2016)
Jun 16 2016Waiver of right of respondents Graeme Hancock & Fennemore Craig, P. C. to respond filed.
Jun 20 2016Brief of respondents Leroy Haeger, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 30 2016Reply of petitioner The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed.
Jul 27 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 29 2016Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 15-1491 is granted limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Nov 14 2016Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Nov 14 2016Brief of petitioner The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed.
Nov 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Nov 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Dec 05 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 10, 2017.
Dec 07 2016Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 12 2016CIRCULATED.
Dec 12 2016Record received from U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic.
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondents Leroy Haeger, et al. filed. (Distributed).
Jan 03 2017Reply of petitioner The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed. (Distributed)
Jan 10 2017Argued. For petitioner: Pierre H. Bergeron, Washington, D. C. For respondents: John J. Egbert, Phoenix, Ariz.
Jan 17 2017Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the District of Arizona (Phoenix) (1 box).
Apr 18 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which all other Members joined, except Gorsuch, J., who took no part in the consideration or decision of the case.
May 22 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 11 2017Record from the U.S.D.C. District of Arizona-Phoenix has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pierre H. Bergeron
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
2550 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

pierre.bergeron@squirepb.com
(202) 457-5601
Party name: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Attorneys for Respondents
John J. Egbert
    Counsel of Record
Jennings Strouss & Salmon, P.L.C.
One E. Washington St., Suite 1900
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2554

jegbert@jsslaw.com
(602) 262-5994
Party name: Leroy Haeger, et al.
Andrew M. Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.
One South Church Ave., Suite 1500
Tucson, AZ 85701

ajacobs@swlaw.com
(520) 882-1207
Party name: Graeme Hancock & Fennemore Craig, P. C.
Other
Philip S. GoldbergShook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

pgoldberg@shb.com
(202) 783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers
Linda A. KleinAmerican Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association