No. 15-1256
Title:Shannon Nelson, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:April 8, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(13SC495)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:February 8, 2016
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2016)
Apr 19 2016Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed.
May 03 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 11 2016Response Requested.(Due June 10, 2016)
May 20 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2016.
Jun 10 2016Brief amicus curiae of Colorado Criminal Defense Bar filed.
Aug 09 2016Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Aug 18 2016Reply of petitioners Shannon Nelson and Louis Alonzo Madden filed.
Aug 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 29 2016Petition GRANTED.
Nov 14 2016Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Nov 14 2016Brief of petitioners Shannon Nelson and Louis Alonzo Madden filed.
Nov 17 2016Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Nov 18 2016Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice and the Cato Institute filed.
Nov 21 2016Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Dec 05 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 9, 2017.
Dec 07 2016Record requested from the Supreme Court of Colorado.
Dec 12 2016CIRCULATED.
Dec 13 2016Record received from the Supreme Court of Colorado in Case 13SC495. 1 Box (part of the record is SEALED).
Dec 14 2016Brief of respondent Colorado filed. (Distributed)
Dec 22 2016Reply of petitioners Shannon Nelson and Louis Alonzo Madden filed. (Distributed)
Jan 05 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Colorado in Case 13SC496. 1 Box (part of the record is SEALED).
Jan 09 2017Argued. For petitioners: Stuart Banner, Los Angeles, Cal. For respondent: Frederick R. Yarger, Solicitor General, Denver, Colo.
Mar 28 2017Letter dated March 24, 2017, from counsel for the respondent informing the Court of recently enacted legislation received. (Distributed)
Apr 19 2017Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of the cases.
May 22 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.
May 22 2017MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 11 2017Record from the Supreme Court of Colorado has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
(310) 206-8506
Party name: Shannon Nelson and Louis Alonzo Madden
Attorneys for Respondent
Frederick R. Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Judicial Center
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
(720) 508-6168
Party name: Colorado
L. Andrew CooperCriminal Appeals Section
1300 Broadway Street
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
(720) 508-6465
Party name: Colorado
Glenn E. Roper1300 Broadway, 10th floor
Denver, CO 80203

glenn.roper@coag.gov
720-508-6562
Party name: Colorado
Other
Robert FishmanRidley, McGreevy & Winocur, PC
303 16th Street, Suite 200
Denver, CO 80202

fishman@ridleylaw.com
(303) 629-9700
Party name: Colorado Criminal Defense Bar
M. Reed HopperPacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

mrh@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Andrew J. PincusMayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David Gordon Post3225 33rd Place, NW
Washington, DC 20008

david.g.post@gmail.com
(202) 256-7375
Party name: Institute for Justice and Cato Institute