No. 23A351 | |
Title: | American Forest & Paper Association, et al., Applicants v. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. |
Docketed: | October 18, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-1191) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 13 2023 | Application (23A351) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Oct 19 2023 | Response to application (23A351) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on October 30, 2023. |
Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent Environmental Protection Agency, et al. filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County,TX filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 30 2023 | Response to application from respondent Public Interest Respondents filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 01 2023 | Reply of applicant American Forest & Paper Association, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Jonathan Yates Ellis Counsel of Record | McGuireWoods LLP 888 16th Street N.W. Suite 500 Washington, DC 20006 JELLIS@MCGUIREWOODS.COM | 919-755-6688 |
Party name: American Forest & Paper Association, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al. | ||
Barbara Dale Underwood Counsel of Record | Solicitor General Office of the Attorney General 28 Liberty Street New York, NY 10005-1400 BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV | 212-416-8016 |
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Jersey, Pennsylvania, and Wisconsin, and District of Columbia, City of New York, and Harris County,TX | ||
Megan Marie Herzog Counsel of Record | Donahue & Goldberg, LLP 1008 Pennsylvania Avenue SE Washington, DC 20003 megan@donahuegoldberg.com | 650-353-8719 |
Party name: Public Interest Respondents |