No. 20-845 | |
Title: | Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Petitioner v. Veronica Degraffenreid, Acting Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al. |
Docketed: | December 23, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District |
Case Numbers: | (149 MM 2020) |
Decision Date: | October 23, 2020 Rule 12.4 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 21 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2021) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Dec 21 2020 | Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 23 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Attorneys. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 28 2020 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (January 07, 2021) |
Dec 30 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Republican Party of Pennsylvania. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 30 2020 | Response to motion for expedited consideration from respondent Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 04 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Delaware County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 04 2021 | Brief in support of motion of petitioner Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 06 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Crawford County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 07 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Allegheny County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 08 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (January 19, 2021) |
Jan 11 2021 | Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED. |
Jan 14 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Kathy Boockvar, Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 15 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Luzerne County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 19 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (January 26, 2021) |
Jan 20 2021 | Waiver of right of respondents Bucks County Board of Elections; Chester County Board of Elections; Montgomery County Board of Elections; Philadelphia County Board of Elections; Omar Sabir; Al Schmidt; and Lisa Deeley to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 21 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Allegheny County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 21 2021 | Waiver of right of respondents Various County Boards of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 22 2021 | Waiver of Susquehanna County Board of Elections of right to respond not accepted for filing. (January 26, 2021) |
Jan 22 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Susquehanna County Board of Elections to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
Jan 27 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 17, 2021) |
Feb 17 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (February 18, 2021) |
Feb 18 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 10, 2021) |
Feb 22 2021 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Constitutional Attorneys GRANTED. |
Feb 22 2021 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Republican Party of Pennsylvania GRANTED. |
Feb 22 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
Mar 15 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank not accepted for filing. (March 25, 2021) |
Mar 26 2021 | Amicus brief of Todd C. Bank submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John C. Eastman Counsel of Record | 174 West Lincoln Avenue, Suite 620 Anaheim, CA 92805 jeastman562@gmail.com | (909) 257-3869 |
Party name: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Joseph Matthias Cosgrove Counsel of Record | Selingo Guagliardo LLC 345 Market Street Kingston, PA 18704-0000 jmcosgro@msn.com | 570-287-2400 |
Party name: Luzerne County Board of Elections | ||
John Bartley DeLone Counsel of Record | Attorney General's Office Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General -Appellate Litigation Section 15th Floor, Strawberry Square Harrisburg, PA 17120 jdelone@attorneygeneral.gov | 717-783-3226 |
Party name: Veronica Degraffenreid, Acting Secretary of Pennsylvania | ||
Molly Elizabeth Meacham Counsel of Record | Babst Calland Clements and Zomnir, PC Two Gateway Center, 603 Stanwix Street Pittsburgh, PA 15222 mmeacham@babstcalland.com | 412-600-8528 |
Party name: Various County Boards of Elections | ||
Allan Joseph Opsitnick Counsel of Record | Allegheny County Law Department 300 Fort Pitt Commons Building Pittsburgh, PA 15219 aopsitnick@opsitnickslaw.com | 4123913299 |
Party name: Allegheny County Board of Elections | ||
Robert D. Schaub Counsel of Record | Rosenn, Jenkins & Greenwald 1065 Highway 315 Wilkes-Barre, PA 18702 rschaub@rjglaw.com | 5708265652 |
Party name: Susquehanna County Board of Elections | ||
Robert Andrew Wiygul Counsel of Record | Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller One Logan Square, 27th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19103 rwiygul@hangley.com | 215-496-7042 |
Party name: Bucks County Board of Elections; Chester County Board of Elections; Montgomery County Board of Elections; Philadelphia County Board of Elections; Omar Sabir; Al Schmidt; and Lisa Deeley | ||
Keith A. Button | Shafer Law Firm, PC 890 Market St. Meadville, PA 16335 | 814-7244540 |
Party name: Crawford County Board of Elections | ||
Edward D. Rogers | Ballard Spahr, LLP 1735 Market Street, 51st Floor Philadelphia, PA 191031 rogerse@ballardspahr.com | 215-864-8144 |
Party name: Delaware County Board of Elections | ||
Other | ||
Todd Charles Bank Counsel of Record | Todd C. Bank, Attorney at Law, P.C. 119-40 Union Turnpike Fourth Floor Kew Gardens, NY 11415 tbank@toddbanklaw.com | (718) 520-7125 |
Party name: Todd C. Bank | ||
John Allen Eidsmoe Counsel of Record | Constitutional Attorneys P.O.Box 179 Montgomery, AL 36101 eidsmoeja@juno.com | 3343241812 |
Party name: Constitutional Attorneys | ||
Thomas W. King III Counsel of Record | 128 West Cunningham Street Butler, PA 16001 tking@dmkcg.com | 7242832200 |
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania |