No. 20-365
Title:Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
VIP Products LLC
Docketed:September 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16012)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Oct 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 19, 2020 to November 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 18, 2020.
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Alcohol Beverage Industry Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Campari America LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constellation Brands, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Campbell Soup Company filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bennett Evan Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1850 North Central Avenue, Suite 1400
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bcooper@dickinsonwright.com
(602) 285-5000
Party name: VIP Products LLC
Other
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Campbell Soup Company
David H. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dhbernstein@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: International Trademark Association
Edward Tuck Colbert
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

ecolbert@huntonak.com
(202) 662-3010
Party name: Constellation Brands, Inc.
Margaret M. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University Chicago School of Law
25 E Pearson Street
Chicago, IL 60611

mduncan@luc.edu
312 915 7120
Party name: The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Campari America LLC
Daniel Paul Weick
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Daniel P. Weick
15 William St., #32F
New York, NY 10005

d.p.weick@columbia.edu
9292632436
Party name: Alcohol Beverage Industry Associations