No. 20-1639 | |
Title: | George K. Young, Jr., Petitioner v. Hawaii, et al. |
Docketed: | May 25, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (12-17808) |
Decision Date: | March 24, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 11 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 25 2021 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, George K. Young, Jr. |
Blanket Consent | |
Jun 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 24, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2021. |
Jun 22 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Hawaii Rifle Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 24 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition and Firearms Policy Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 24 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation Center to Keep and Bear Arms filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 24 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Louisiana, Arizona, Montana, and Eighteen Other States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 24 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Heller Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 24 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of Hawaii Firearms Coalition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 26 2021 | Brief of respondents Hawaii, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 11 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. |
Aug 23 2021 | Reply of petitioner George K. Young, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022. |
Jun 30 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of New York State Rifle & Pistol Assn., Inc. v. Bruen, 597 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Aug 01 2022 | JUDGMENT ISSUED |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Alan Alexander Beck Counsel of Record | Law Offices of Alan Beck 2692 Harcourt Drive San Diego, CA 92123 alan.alexander.beck@gmail.com | 6199059105 |
Party name: George K. Young, Jr. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 Thirteenth St., N.W. Washington, DC 20004 neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | 202 637 5528 |
Party name: State of Hawaii, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Amy L. Bellantoni Counsel of Record | The Bellantoni Law Firm, PLLC 2 0verhill Road, Suite 400 Scardale, NY 10583 abell@bellantoni-law.com | 914367-0090 |
Party name: Hawaii Firearms Coalition | ||
David T. Hardy Counsel of Record | 8987 E. Tanque Verde No. 265 Tucson, AZ 85749 dthardy@mindspring.com | 520-749-0241 |
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition and Firearms Policy Foundation | ||
Elizabeth Baker Murrill Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 1885 N. Third Street Baton Rouge, LA 70802 murrille@ag.louisiana.gov | 225-326-6766 |
Party name: Louisiana, Arizona, Montana, and Eighteen Other States | ||
Kevin Gerard O'Grady Counsel of Record | The Law Office of Kevin O'Grady, LLC 1136 Union Mall, Suite 808 Honolulu, HI 96813 Kevin@kevinogradylaw.com | 808-521-3367 |
Party name: Hawaii Rifle Association | ||
William Jeffrey Olson Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180 wjo@mindspring.com | 7033565070 |
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Heller Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee | ||
Cody James Wisniewski Counsel of Record | Mountain States Legal Foundation 2596 S. Lewis Way Lakewood, CO 80227 cody@mslegal.org | 303-292-2021 |
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation Center to Keep and Bear Arms |