No. 19-659
Title:Miladis Salgado, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 21, 2019
Linked with 19A321
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10312-C)
   Decision Date:July 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2019Application (19A321) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 6, 2019 to November 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Application (19A321) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 21, 2019.
Nov 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Miladis Salgado.
Blanket Consent
Dec 05 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Practicing Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 20 2019Response Requested. (Due January 21, 2020)
Dec 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Justin Marc Pearson
    Counsel of Record
lnstitute for Justice
2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3180
Miami, FL 33131

JPearson@IJ.org
(305) 721-1600
Party name: Miladis Salgado
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Samuel Guy MacRoberts
    Counsel of Record
Kansas Justice Institute
12980 Metcalf Avenue, Suite 130
Overland Park, KS 66213

sam.macroberts@kansasjusticeinstitute.org
913-213-5018
Party name: Practicing Attorneys
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8217
Party name: Law and Economics Scholars