Docket for 16-9
No. 16-9 | |
Title: |
Randolph Wolfson, Petitioner |
v. |
Colleen Concannon, et al. |
|
Docketed: | June 29, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1037 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-17634) |
Decision Date: | January 27, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 7 2016 |
Application (15A1037) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 26, 2016 to June 25, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Apr 13 2016 |
Application (15A1037) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 25, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 29, 2016) |
Jul 19 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 29, 2016. |
Jul 26 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Center for Competitive Politics filed. |
Aug 29 2016 |
Brief of respondents Colleen Concannon, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 12 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Randolph Wolfson filed. |
Sep 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|