Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15A421
No. 15A421
Title:
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., et al., Applicants
v.
Apple Inc.
Docketed:October 19, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Case Nos.:(2014-1335, 2015-1029)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 19 2015 Application (15A421) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 11, 2015 to December 14, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 20 2015 Application (15A421) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 14, 2015.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kathleen M. Sullivan Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(212) 849-7000
    Counsel of Record51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10010
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
June 24, 2016 | Version 2014.1