Docket for 15-9058
No. 15-9058 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jemaine Monteil Cannon, Petitioner |
v. |
Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden |
|
Docketed: | April 26, 2016 |
Linked with 15A782 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-5071) |
Decision Date: | August 11, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 24, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 20 2016 |
Application (15A782) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 22, 2016 to April 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Feb 2 2016 |
Application (15A782) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 22, 2016. |
Apr 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 26, 2016) |
May 25 2016 |
Brief of respondent Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 6 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Jemaine Monteil Cannon filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|