Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-849
No. 15-849
Title:
The Authors Guild, et al., Petitioners
v.
Google, Inc.
Docketed:December 31, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-4829)
  Decision Date:October 16, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 31 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2016)
Jan 14 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners.
Jan 14 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent
Jan 15 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 1, 2016.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of International Authors Forum (IAF), et al. filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Society of Journalists, et al. filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of Elsevier, Inc., et al. filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amicus curiae of The Copyright Alliance filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of Text and Academic Authors Associaton, et al. filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of Copyright Clearance Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Feb 1 2016 Brief amici curiae of Authors Malcolm Gladwell, et al. filed.
Mar 1 2016 Brief of respondent Google, Inc. in opposition filed.
Mar 15 2016 Reply of petitioners The Authors Guild, et al. filed.
Mar 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 1, 2016.
Apr 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 18 2016 Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Paul M. Smith Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6060
    Counsel of Record1099 New York Avenue, N.W.
Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
psmith@jenner.com
Party name: The Authors Guild, et al.
 
Michael J. Boni 15 St. Asaphs Road (610)-822-0201
Bala Cynwyd, PA  19004
mboni@bonizack.com
Party name: Jim Bouton and Joseph Goulden
Attorneys for Respondent:
Seth P. Waxman Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Google, Inc.
Other:
David Leichtman Robins, Kaplan, L.L.P.(212) 980-7400
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY  10022
dleichtman@robinskaplan.com
Party name: American Society of Journalists, et al.
 
Elizabeth A. McNamara Davis Wright Tremaine LLP(212) 489-8230
1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st Floor
New York, NY  10020
lizmcnamara@dwt.com
Party name: The Copyright Alliance
 
Gloria Corriols Phares Hoffman, Marshall, Strong, LLP(646) 741-4564
116 W 23rd Street, Suite 500
New York, NY  10011
gcphares@hmscounsel.com
Party name: Authors Malcolm Gladwell, et al.
 
R. Bruce Rich Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP(212) 310-8000
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY  10153
bruce.rich@weil.com
Party name: Copyright Clearance Center, Inc., et al.
 
Charles S. Sims Proskauer Rose LLP(212) 969-3950
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY  10036
csims@proskauer.com
Party name: Elsevier, Inc., et al.
 
J. Matthew Williams Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP(202) 355-7900
1818 N. Street NW, 8th Floor
Washington, DC  20036
mxw@msk.com
Party name: International Authors Forum (IAF), et al.
 
Nancy E. Wolff Cowan, DeBates, Abrahams & heppard, LLP(212) 974-7474
41 Madison Avenue, 34th Floor
New York, NY  10010
nwolff@cdas.com
Party name: Text and Academic Authors Associaton, et al.
May 31, 2016 | Version 2014.1