Docket for 15-80
No. 15-80 | |
Title: |
David Allen, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Robert Goguen |
|
Docketed: | July 17, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-2278) |
Decision Date: | March 12, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 16, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 15 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2015) |
Jul 27 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Robert Goguen to respond filed. |
Aug 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|