~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 25 2015 |
Application (15A579) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2015 to January 21, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 4 2015 |
Application (15A579) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 21, 2016. |
Jan 21 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 2, 2016) |
Mar 18 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 18, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
May 4 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 11 2016 |
Record Requested . |
May 17 2016 |
Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals for the State of Alabama. The record is electronic. |
May 18 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 6 2016 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Hurst v. Florida, 577 U. S. ___ (2016). |
Jul 8 2016 |
MANDATE ISSUED |
Jul 8 2016 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED |