Docket for 15-775
No. 15-775 | |
Title: |
Department of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
CNS International Ministries, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 15, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-1507) |
Decision Date: | September 17, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 15 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2016) |
Jan 14 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 28, 2016. |
Jan 28 2016 |
Brief of respondents CNS International Ministries, et al. in opposition filed. |
Feb 17 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 4, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Zubik v. Burwell, 578 U. S. ___ (2016). Nothing in the Zubik opinion, or in the opinions or orders of the courts below, is to affect the ability of the Government to ensure that women covered by respondents� health plans �obtain, without cost, the full range of FDA approved contraceptives.� Wheaton College v. Burwell, 573 U. S. ___, ___ (2014) (slip op., at 1). Through this litigation, respondents have made the Government aware of their view that they meet �the requirements for exemption from the contraceptive coverage requirement on religious grounds.� Id., at ___ (slip op., at 2). Nothing in the Zubik opinion, or in the opinions or orders of the courts below, �precludes the Government from relying on this notice, to the extent it considers it necessary, to facilitate the provision of full contraceptive coverage� going forward. Ibid. Because the Government may rely on this notice, the Government may not impose taxes or penalties on respondents for failure to provide the relevant notice. Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Ginsburg joins, concurs in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand in this case for the reasons expressed in Zubik v. Burwell, 578 U. S. ___ (2016) (Sotomayor, J., concurring). |
Jun 17 2016 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|