Docket for 15-7611
No. 15-7611 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Etheria Verdell Jackson, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | January 5, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-11715-P) |
Decision Date: | July 31, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 29 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 4, 2016) |
Feb 3 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 4, 2016. |
Mar 4 2016 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Mar 17 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Etheria Verdell Jackson filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
May 11 2016 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
May 17 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 6 2016 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|