Docket for 15-6669
No. 15-6669 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Azad Haji Abdullah, Petitioner |
v. |
Idaho |
|
Docketed: | October 27, 2015 |
Linked with 15A113 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Idaho |
Case Nos.: | (31659, 39417) |
Decision Date: | March 2, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 28, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 20 2015 |
Application (15A113) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 26, 2015 to October 25, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 30 2015 |
Application (15A113) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 25, 2015. |
Oct 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 27, 2015) |
Dec 7 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 26, 2016. |
Jan 25 2016 |
Brief of respondent Idaho in opposition filed. |
Feb 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|