Docket for 15-6648
No. 15-6648 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Garrett Freeman, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | October 26, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-70001) |
Decision Date: | June 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 8 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 25, 2015) |
Nov 24 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Dec 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|